Simon et al v. Erie Insurance Co et al

Plaintiff: Dianne P Simon and Mark A Simon
Defendant: Erie Insurance Co, Allstate Insurance Co and Marlon K Baese
Case Number: 6:2010cv00338
Filed: February 26, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Vermilion
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Presiding Judge: Tucker L Melancon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court REMAND ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this matter is REMANDED to the 15th Judicial District Court, Parish of Vermillion, State of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/16/10. (crt,Yocum, M)
September 7, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JURISDICTIONAL Amount Review Ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/7/2010. (crt,Kennedy, T)
August 23, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION ON JURISDICTIONAL AMOUNT. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that or on before September 3, 2010, defendants shall file a memorandum setting forth specific facts in controversy, which support a findingthat the jurisdictional amount exists and citing applicable case law involving similar facts andwhich reflect verdicts in an amount of $75,000.00 or more.Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/20/10. (crt,Jordan, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon et al v. Erie Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erie Insurance Co
Represented By: Michael P Corry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlon K Baese
Represented By: Michael P Corry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne P Simon
Represented By: Blake Rossi David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A Simon
Represented By: Blake Rossi David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?