Penick v. Morgan City et al

Plaintiff: Gary Randall Penick
Defendant: City of Morgan City, Herbert Johnson and Stacey LaBelle
Case Number: 6:2010cv00339
Filed: February 23, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 32 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the plaintiff's civil rights complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failing to state a claim on which relief may be granted in accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Sections 1915 and 1915A. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 11/05/10. (crt,Guidry, C)
October 8, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Gary Randall Penick, 12 Amended Complaint filed by Gary Randall Penick Accordingly,IT IS RECOMMENDED that plaintiffs civil rights complaint beDISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failing to state a claim on which relief maybe granted in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915 and 1915A Objections to R&R due by 10/25/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/8/10. (crt,Jordan, P)
January 28, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Gary Randall Penick Objections to R&R due by 2/11/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III.(car, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 3/1/2010.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penick v. Morgan City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Randall Penick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Morgan City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey LaBelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?