Smetana et al v. Apache Corp of Delaware et al

Plaintiff: Brandy S Smetana and Billy W Smetana
Defendant: Montco Offshore Inc and Apache Corp of Delaware
Case Number: 6:2010cv00349
Filed: March 1, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: St. Landry
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 43:1331 General Maritime/OCSLA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2012 249 Opinion or Order of the Court REASONS FOR JUDGMENT on Motion to Amend (# 210). Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 4/18/12. (crt,Brazell, G)
November 21, 2011 188 Opinion or Order of the Court REASONS FOR JUDGMENT as to Motion for Summary Judgment 112 by defendant Apache Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 11/21/11. (crt,Brazell, G)
August 22, 2011 166 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 72 Motion for Summary Judgment by Liberty against Apache re: Apache's cross claims involving Montco; granting 80 Motion for Summary Judgment by Wise Well against Apache; granting 116 Motion for Summary Judgment by Libert y against Stokes & Spiehler; granting 117 Motion for Summary Judgment by Liberty against McGilvray; denying 126 Motion for Summary Judgment by McGilvray and Stokes & Spiehler against Liberty; denying 127 Motion for Summary Judgment by Apache against McGilvray and Stokes & Spiehler; denying 128 Motion for Summary Judgment by McGilvray and Stokes & Spiehler against Wise Well; granting 136 Motion for Summary Judgment by Liberty against Apache on Cross Claim of Apache regarding Stokes & Spiehler claim for coverage; granting 137 Motion for Summary Judgment by Liberty against Apache on Cross Claim of Apache regarding McGilvray's claim for coverage. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 8/19/2011. (crt,Putch, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smetana et al v. Apache Corp of Delaware et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montco Offshore Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apache Corp of Delaware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy S Smetana
Represented By: Miles A Matt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy W Smetana
Represented By: Miles A Matt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?