Louisiana Crawfish Producers Association - West et al v. Mallard Basin Inc et al

Plaintiff: Louisiana Crawfish Producers Association - West and Atchafalaya Basinkeeper
Defendant: Mallard Basin Inc. and Whiskey Bay Island LLC
Case Number: 6:2010cv01085
Filed: July 6, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: St. Martin
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319 Clean Water Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2017 265 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 250 Report and Recommendations; granting 224 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 240 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. ORDERED that plaintiff's first, second and third causes of action under the Endangered Species Act, contained in their Third and Fourth Complaints are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 3/8/17. (crt,Roaix, G)
December 4, 2015 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The plaintiffs' 179 Motion for Discovery is granted. The plaintiffs are permitted to perform a Rule 34 site inspection in accordance with the terms and details set forth in their draft Rule 34 Request attached to the Motion. [rec . doc. 179-2]. Within 7 days, the parties shall agree on a mutually convenient date for the inspection. The inspection shall be performed no later than 1/31/2016. The plaintiffs may serve a Rule 34 Request/Notice on the defendants incorporating the agreed upon inspection date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/4/2015. (crt,Alexander, E)
August 25, 2014 165 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING. The 138 Motion to Compel is DENIED, without prejudice to the rights of the plaintiffs to re-urge the motion if appropriate. 143 Motion for Protective Order is granting in part and denying in part. The motion is GRANTED to th e extent that the plaintiffs will not be allowed additional discovery relative to the claims based on the Clean Water Act and the Endangered Species Act. The motion is DENIED to the extent that the plaintiffs will be allowed to pursue additional disc overy, limited to the NEPA challenge to the adequacy of the Corps analysis of the alternatives or impacts associated with the permits at issue. The claims of the parties for costs/expenses and fees for these motions are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/25/2014. (crt,Alexander, E)
February 24, 2014 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 118 Motion to Strike Portions of 115 Second Supplement to the Administrative Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 2/24/2014. (crt,Dauterive, C)
June 27, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 91 Motion to Intervene. The motion is therefore GRANTED as to Atchafalaya Investments, LLC and Whiskey Bay Island LLC. The motion is also GRANTED as to Mallard Basin Inc. Although the Court finds Mallard Basin no longer has suffici ent interests in the property, permits, or other aspects of this action to be entitled to intervene of right under Rule 24, permissiveintervention under Rule 24(b) is appropriate since Mallard Basin remains a defendant in the lead case, and in its defense against the alleged Clean Water Act violations, the validity of the previous permits involves a common question of law or fact. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/27/13. (crt,Kennedy, T)
October 3, 2012 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 71 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge filed by Atchafalaya Basinkeeper, Louisiana Environmental Action Network, Louisiana Crawfish Producers Association - West. IT IS ORDERED that the decision of the magistrate judge to stay the instant matter pending the completion of the Corpss agency review process pursuant to 33 C.F.R. §325.7, and his Ruling dated March 15, 2012 [Doc. 68], are AFFIRMED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the instant case shall remain STAYED AND SHALL BE PLACED ON THIS COURTS ADMINISTRATIVE DOCKET. Notwithstanding the continuation of the stay, all reporting requirements to the magistrate judge remain in effect. It is further ORDERED that the trial and pre-trial conference dates are UPSET. The trial will be reset, if necessary, upon completion of the agency review process.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the magistrate judge shall immediately notify this Court upon receipt of the Corpss final decision on the permits in question. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 10/03/12. (crt,Guidry, C)
March 22, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING For these reasons, the 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Atchafalaya Basinkeeper, Louisiana Crawfish Producers Association - West is AFFIRMED. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim" is DENIED in its entirety. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 3/22/11. (crt,Guidry, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louisiana Crawfish Producers Association - West et al v. Mallard Basin Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Crawfish Producers Association - West
Represented By: Leigh Ann Haynie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atchafalaya Basinkeeper
Represented By: Leigh Ann Haynie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallard Basin Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whiskey Bay Island LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?