Bourque v. C N H America L L C et al

Plaintiff: Bobby James Bourque, Peggy Bourque, Margaret Lynn Suire, Dawn Marie Touchet, Bobby James Bourque, Jr and Travis James Bourque
Defendant: C N H America L L C, Progressive Tractor & Implement Co. and C N H Global N V
Case Number: 6:2010cv01347
Filed: August 26, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Acadia
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2015 381 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON OBJECTIONS TO THE DEPOSITION OF BOBBY BOURQUE. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 4/1/15. (crt,Jordan, P)
February 6, 2012 126 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 109 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 106 Order on Motion for Protective Order filed by C N H America L L C. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 2/3/2012. (crt,Kennedy, T)
October 14, 2011 106 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part, denying as moot in part, and denying 66 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part, denying as moot in part, and denying 70 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part, denying as moot in part, and den ying 72 Motion for Protective Order. To the extent there are any claims for costs or attorney's fees incorporated into any of these motions, they are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/14/2011. (crt,Alexander, E) Modified text on 10/14/2011. (Alexander, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bourque v. C N H America L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C N H America L L C
Represented By: Clarence M Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Tractor & Implement Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C N H Global N V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby James Bourque
Represented By: David Patrick Daniel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Bourque
Represented By: David Patrick Daniel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Lynn Suire
Represented By: David Patrick Daniel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Marie Touchet
Represented By: David Patrick Daniel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby James Bourque, Jr
Represented By: David Patrick Daniel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis James Bourque
Represented By: David Patrick Daniel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?