Hughes v. Gueydan Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Mark Slade Hughes
Defendant: Gueydan Police Department, Chief Blake Hebert, Chief Stoney Broussard, Officer Glenn Mallet, Officer Jesse Ewing, Andrea Lantier Hughes, Francis P. Smith and Leslie Pharris
Case Number: 6:2010cv01570
Filed: October 14, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Vermilion
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court PARTIAL JUDGMENT ADOPTING 26 GRANTING Motion to Strike filed by Town of Gueydan, and accordingly, plaintiff's claim for punitive damages against the Town of Gueydan, asserted under both Federal and Louisiana state law, is Stricken 30 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 4/4/11. (crt,Jordan, P)
January 19, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 16 Report and Recommendations, 9 Motion to Strike filed by Glenn Mallet, Stoney Broussard, Blake Hebert, Jesse Ewing. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Strike [9[ is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and accordingly, plaintiff& #039;s claims for punitive damages asserted under Louisiana state law, and plaintiff's claims for punitive damages under federal law against Former Chief Hebert, Chief Broussard, Officer Ewing and Officer Mallet, in their official capacities, ar e STRICKEN, and plaintiff's claims for punitive damages under federal law against Former Chief Hebert, Chief Broussard, Officer Ewing and Officer Mallet, in their individual capacities, shall remain pending. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/19/11. (crt,Guidry, C)
December 30, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 MOTION to Strike Penalty, Punitive, Special or Exemplary Damages filed by Glenn Mallet, Stoney Broussard, Blake Hebert, Jesse Ewing For the following reasons, it is recommended that the Motion to Strike [rec. doc. 9]be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and, accordingly, plaintiffs claims forpunitive damages asserted under Louisiana state law, and plaintiffs claims for punitivedamages under federal law against Former Chief Hebert, Chief Broussard, Office r Ewing andOfficer Mallet, in their official capacities, should be Stricken, and plaintiffs claims forpunitive damages under federal law against Former Chief Hebert, Chief Broussard, OfficerEwing and Officer Mallet, in their individual capacities, should remain pending. Objections to R&R due by 1/18/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 12/30/10. Sent copy of R&R to RFD this date(crt,Jordan, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Gueydan Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gueydan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Blake Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Stoney Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Glenn Mallet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jesse Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Lantier Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis P. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Pharris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Slade Hughes
Represented By: Michael Laurence Barras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?