Maryland Co L L C v. Exxon Mobil Corp et al
Plaintiff: Maryland Co L L C
Defendant: Allen W Wendler, Mary Hugh Arnold Scott, Ener Corp, Stuart Bruce Robinson, Marshall Earth Resources Inc, Paul Di Portanova, Francis P King, Douglas B Marshall, III, Margaret G Price, Cockspur Inc, Melinda Jovita Cullen, Hugh Roy Marshall, Quintana Minerals Corp, Robert A Higley, Carroll R Hochner, Martha Katherine Long, Max C Butler, Wilhelmina R Morian, Roy H Cullen, Cornelia Cullen Long, Camex Inc, Alisa Erin O'Leary, Meredith J Long, Deborah Robinson Tom, LA Dept of Natural Resources, Wilhelmina B Traylor, Robert J Barnhart, Hugh Roy Marshall, Jr, Benjamin Cullen Marshall, Robert C Hux, Katherine Cullen McCord, Alistar Corp, Isaac Arnold, Jr, Exxon Mobil Corp, Cornelia O'Leary Zilkha, Harry H Cullen, Jr, Roy Walter Cullen, Corbin J Robertson, Jr, Jeffrey Michael Grieff, Lillie T Robertson, Isaac Arnold, III, Katherine A Cattanach, Robert Tilly Arnold, Robert Ludwig Cullen, Antoinette Arnold Maywald, John Cavanaugh O'Leary, Jr, Alison R Baumann, Gregory R Hovas, Russell Scott, Jr, Arnold Corp, V Richard Viebig, Jr, Harry H Cullen, Legacy Trust Co N A, Antonette Tilly Arnold and Walter S Baker, Jr
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P
3Rd Party Defendant: Hilcorp Energy I L P and Hilcorp Energy Co
Case Number: 6:2010cv01781
Filed: November 30, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lafayette Office
County: St. Mary
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2014 Filing 266 CERTIFICATE of Clerk to Destroy Exhibits. (crt,Kennedy, T)
January 28, 2014 Filing 265 NOTICE of Intent to Destroy Exhibits in a civil case by Clerk of Court. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 31, 2012 Filing 264 JUDGMENT.... Settlement was placed on the record this date. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 5/30/12. (crt,Jordan, P)
May 30, 2012 Filing 263 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Richard T Haik, Sr: granting #257 Motion for Settlement; granting #257 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss; MOTION HEARING held on 5/30/2012 re #257 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss filed by Maryland Co L L C. (Court Reporter: Mary Tompson) (crt,Jordan, P)
May 29, 2012 Filing 262 RESPONSE to Motion re #247 MOTION for Settlement Approval with Burlington JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Burlington and Quintana Defendants, #257 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alistar Corp, Antonette Tilly Arnold, Isaac Arnold, III, Isaac Arnold, Jr, Robert Tilly Arnold, Arnold Corp, Walter S Baker, Jr, Robert J Barnhart, Alison R Baumann, Katherine A Cattanach, Cockspur Inc, Harry H Cullen, Jr, Harry H Cullen, Melinda Jovita Cullen, Robert Ludwig Cullen, Roy Walter Cullen, Roy H Cullen, Ener Corp, Jeffrey Michael Grieff, Carroll R Hochner, Gregory R Hovas, Francis P King, Legacy Trust Co N A, Cornelia Cullen Long, Martha Katherine Long, Meredith J Long, Benjamin Cullen Marshall, Douglas B Marshall, III, Hugh Roy Marshall, Jr, Hugh Roy Marshall, Marshall Earth Resources Inc, Antoinette Arnold Maywald, Katherine Cullen McCord, Wilhelmina R Morian, Alisa Erin O'Leary, John Cavanaugh O'Leary, Jr, Paul Di Portanova, Margaret G Price, Quintana Minerals Corp, Corbin J Robertson, Jr, Lillie T Robertson, Stuart Bruce Robinson, Mary Hugh Arnold Scott, Russell Scott, Jr, Deborah Robinson Tom, Wilhelmina B Traylor, V Richard Viebig, Jr, Allen W Wendler, Cornelia O'Leary Zilkha. (aty,Lee, Amy)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER : The final regularly scheduled status conference in this matter is currently set for May 29, 2012 at 1:30 p.m. In light of the hearing to be held before Judge Haik on May 30, 2012, IT IS ORDERED that the status conference is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/21/2012. (crt,Kennedy, T)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiffs motion for approval of its settlement with defendant Burlington Resources Oil & Gas, LP and to dismiss the plaintiffs claims against Burlington and the Quintana Defendants (Rec. Doc. 247) which had been deferred by the undersigned pending finalization of settlement be referred to the District Court for ruling pursuant to La. R.S. 30:29(j). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the joint motion for approval of the settlement between the plaintiff and defendant ExxonMobil Corporation and third-party defendants Hilcorp Energy Company and Hilcorp Energy I, L.P. (Rec. Doc. 257) pursuant to La. R.S. 30:29(j) is REFERRED to the district Court for ruling. Set Hearing as to #247 MOTION for Settlement Approval with Burlington JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Burlington and Quintana Defendants, #257 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss : Motion day set for 5/30/2012 03:00 PM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Richard T Haik Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/16/2012. (crt,Kennedy, T)
May 16, 2012 Filing 259 MINUTES for TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/16/2012. (crt,Bacon, C)
May 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER, ( Magistrate Judge Status Conference set for 5/16/2012 11:00 AM in by phone before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/11/12. (crt,Brazell, G)
May 10, 2012 Filing 257 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval, JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by Maryland Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Text of proposed order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(aty,Daschbach, Emma)
April 17, 2012 Filing 256 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 4/17/2012. Counsel discussed the status of the finalization of the settlement of the main demand and the status of the settlement negotiations concerning the third-party demand. (crt,Brazell, G)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that a telephone status conference is hereby SET for 1:30 p.m. on Tuesday, April 17, 2012. Counsel for Hilcorp shall organize the conference call to chambers at (337) 593-5140. (Magistrate Judge Status Conference set for 4/17/2012 01:30 PM by phone before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 4/9/2012. (crt,Dauterive, C)
April 2, 2012 Filing 254 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings filed for Settlement Conference held on 03/27/2012 before Judge Patrick J. Hanna. Court Reporter LaRae E. Bourque, Telephone number (337)593-5221. Pages: 1 - 13 Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. Redaction Request due 4/26/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/7/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2012. (crt,Bourque, LaRae)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 253 30 DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 3/28/2012. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that defendant Burlington Resources Oil & Gas LP's third-party demand against Hilcorp Energy Co and Hilcorp Energy I L P is herebySEVERED from the main demand for all purposes. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #145 for Contempt Against ExxonMobil Corp Pursuant to FRCP 37(b)(2)(A)(vii) is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #215 Motion for Protective Order is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #231 Motion to Require Compliance with Settlement Provisions of LA. R.S. 30:29 is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ruling on #247 Motion for Settlement is DEFERRED pending finalization of the settlement agreement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/29/2012. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 28, 2012 Motions Transferred regarding #249 SEALED MOTION . Motions referred to Richard T Haik, Sr. (crt,Kennedy, T)
March 28, 2012 Filing 249 SEALED MOTION by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading Sealed Settlement Agreement)(aty,Price, Andrea)
March 27, 2012 Filing 251 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/27/2012. (crt,Jordan, P)
March 27, 2012 Filing 250 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: MOTION HEARING held on 3/27/2012 re #145 MOTION for Contempt Against ExxonMobil Corp Pursuant to FRCP 37(b)(2)(A)(vii) filed by Maryland Co L L C, #247 MOTION for Settlement Approval with Burlington JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Burlington and Quintana Defendants filed by Maryland Co L L C, #231 MOTION to Require Compliance with Settlement Provisions of LA. R.S. 30:29 filed by Exxon Mobil Corp, #215 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Governor Foster's Deposition filed by Maryland Co L L C. A written ruling and order by the Court will follow.(Court Reporter: LaRae Bourque) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (crt,Jordan, P)
March 27, 2012 Filing 248 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #247 MOTION for Settlement Approval with Burlington JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Burlington and Quintana Defendants. Motion day set for 5/17/2012 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Richard T Haik Sr. (crt,Kennedy, T)
March 27, 2012 Filing 247 MOTION for Settlement Approval with Burlington, JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Burlington and Quintana Defendants by Maryland Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Compliance with Local Rule 7.4.1 (W), #3 Text of proposed order)(aty,Daschbach, Emma)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER granting #237 Motion to Compel 30(B)(6) Deposition of Hilcorp Energy Company and Hilcorp Energy I, L.P.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/20/2012. (crt,Kennedy, T)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ELECTRONIC ORDER. There will be no hearing or status conference on March 16, 2012. Additionally, the plaintiff's pending motion to compel the deposition of the Hilcorp entities will be decided on the briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 03-15-12. (crt,Nations, Sue)
March 14, 2012 Filing 244 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #237 MOTION to Compel 30(B)(6) Deposition of Hilcorp Energy Company and Hilcorp Energy I, L.P. filed by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Maryland Co.'s Answer to Exxon's 1st Set of Interrogatories)(aty,Thorp, Seth)
March 13, 2012 Filing 243 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings filed for Status Conference held on 03/09/2012 before Judge Patrick J. Hanna. Court Reporter LaRae E. Bourque, Telephone number (337)593-5221. Pages: 1 - 17 Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. Redaction Request due 4/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/14/2012. (crt,Bourque, LaRae)
March 9, 2012 Filing 242 SEALED DOCUMENT: Settlement Agreement and Release by Maryland Co L L C re #241 Status Conference. (crt,Jordan, P)
March 9, 2012 Filing 241 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: MONTHLYSTATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/9/2012. (Court Reporter: LaRae Bourque) (crt,Jordan, P)
March 5, 2012 Reset Hearing as to #237 MOTION to Compel 30(B)(6) Deposition of Hilcorp Energy Company and Hilcorp Energy I, L.P.. Motion day set for 3/9/2012 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Kennedy, T)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting #238 Motion to Expedite consideration of #237 MOTION to Compel 30(B)(6) Deposition of Hilcorp Energy Company and Hilcorp Energy I, L.P. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the the Motion is GRANTED and that the Motion will be heard at the 3/9/2012 Status Conference scheduled in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/5/2012. (crt,Kennedy, T)
March 2, 2012 Filing 239 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #237 MOTION to Compel 30(B)(6) Deposition of Hilcorp Energy Company and Hilcorp Energy I, L.P.. Motion day set for 4/25/2012 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Kennedy, T)
February 29, 2012 Filing 238 MOTION to Expedite consideration of #237 MOTION to Compel 30(B)(6) Deposition of Hilcorp Energy Company and Hilcorp Energy I, L.P. by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Daschbach, Emma)
February 29, 2012 Filing 237 MOTION to Compel 30(B)(6) Deposition of Hilcorp Energy Company and Hilcorp Energy I, L.P. by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A and B, #3 Certificate re efforts to resolve-LR 37.1, #4 Text of proposed order)(aty,Daschbach, Emma)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER : Magistrate Judge Status Conference re-set for 3/9/2012 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 2/28/2012. (crt,Kennedy, T)
February 17, 2012 Filing 235 ANSWER to #204 Second Supplemental and Amending Complaint, First Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages, and Original Petition for Damages by Exxon Mobil Corp.(aty,Rolen-Ogden, April) Modified text on 2/21/2012 (Yocum, M).
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 234 SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 4/20/2012. Discovery deadline 4/20/2012. Discovery II due by 4/20/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 5/21/2012. Exchange of Expert Reports due by 5/15/2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other provisions of the original CaseManagement Order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 2/1/2012. (crt,Kennedy, T)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #199 Motion to Continue; denying 212 Motion to Strike #204 Amended Complaint ; granting 212 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; taking under advisement #215 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 2/1/2012. (crt,Kennedy, T)
January 31, 2012 Filing 232 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: MOTION HEARING held on 1/31/2012 re 212 MOTION to Strike #204 Amended Complaint filed by Exxon Mobil Corp, 212 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Exxon Mobil Corp, #199 MOTION to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines with opposition filed by Hilcorp Energy I L P, Hilcorp Energy Co, #215 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Governor Foster's Deposition filed by Maryland Co L L C. A written ruling and order by the Court will follow. (Court Reporter: Mary Tompson) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (crt,Jordan, P)
January 31, 2012 Motions Transferred regarding #231 MOTION to Require Compliance with Settlement Provisions of LA. R.S. 30:29 . Motions referred to Richard T Haik, Sr. (crt,Kennedy, T)
January 31, 2012 Filing 231 MOTION to Require Compliance with Settlement Provisions of LA. R.S. 30:29 by Exxon Mobil Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(aty,Rolen-Ogden, April)
January 30, 2012 Filing 230 REPLY to Response to Motion re 212 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. (crt,Kennedy, T)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting #224 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Hilcorp's Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/30/2012. (crt,Kennedy, T)
January 30, 2012 NOTICE of Corrective Action to April Leigh Rolen-Ogden on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp regarding #226 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. Action taken: Modified text to more accurately identify the pleading submitted. (crt,Kennedy, T)
January 30, 2012 Filing 228 EXHIBIT re #225 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-2, #2 Exhibit D-3, #3 Exhibit D-4, #4 Exhibit D-5, #5 Exhibit D-6)(aty,Price, Andrea)
January 30, 2012 Filing 227 MANUAL ATTACHMENT received from Valerie Vige Guidry on behalf of Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P regarding #225 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,. The original manual attachments will be maintained in the division of the presiding judge, until expiration of appeal delays. (Attachments: #1 Audio CD Description) (crt,Gregory, C)
January 30, 2012 Filing 226 REPLY to Response to Motion re 212 MOTION to Strike #204 Amended Complaint filed by Exxon Mobil Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", in globo)(aty,Rolen-Ogden, April) Modified text to more accurately identify the pleading submitted on 1/30/2012. (Kennedy, T)
January 27, 2012 Filing 225 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #215 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Governor Foster's Deposition filed by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Manual Attachment, #5 Exhibit E)(aty,Price, Andrea) Modified text on 1/30/2012. (Kennedy, T)
January 27, 2012 Filing 224 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Hilcorp's Motion for Extension of Deadlines with consent by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Price, Andrea)
January 26, 2012 Filing 223 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 212 MOTION to Strike #204 Amended Complaint or Alternatively to Extend Fact Discovery to Address New Allegations filed by Maryland Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(aty,Daschbach, Emma)
January 25, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 212 MOTION to Strike #204 Amended Complaint, #215 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Governor Foster's Deposition, 212 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Motion day set for 1/31/2012 01:30 PM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Jordan, P)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting #220 Motion to Expedite. The Motion will be heard at the next scheduled status conference on January 31, 2012 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/25/12. (crt,Jordan, P)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting #218 Motion to Expedite. The Motion will be heard at the January 31, 2012 at 1:30 p.m. status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/25/12. (crt,Jordan, P)
January 24, 2012 Filing 220 MOTION to Expedite consideration of 212 MOTION to Strike #204 Amended Complaint by Exxon Mobil Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Rolen-Ogden, April)
January 24, 2012 Filing 219 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: 212 MOTION to Strike #204 Amended Complaint, 212 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Motion day set for 2/28/2012 01:30 PM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Alexander, E)
January 24, 2012 Filing 218 MOTION to Expedite consideration of #215 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Governor Foster's Deposition by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Daschbach, Emma)
January 24, 2012 Filing 217 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Proposed Order filed by Maryland Co L L C regarding #215 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Governor Foster's Deposition . (aty,Daschbach, Emma)
January 24, 2012 Filing 216 NOTICE of Deficiency to Emma E Daschbach on behalf of Maryland Co L L C regarding #215 DEFICIENT ? MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Governor Foster's Deposition. Reason: Either no proposed order accompanied this motion or the proposed order was not on a separate page. Please see LR7.4.1 or LR58.1 for additional information. (crt,Kennedy, T)
January 24, 2012 Filing 215 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Governor Foster's Deposition by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Certificate re efforts to resolve-LR 37.1)(aty,Daschbach, Emma) Modified to reflect document as deficient on 1/24/2012. (Kennedy, T) Modified on 1/24/2012 to remove deficient status; see #217 Corrective document/Proposed Order (Dauterive, C).
January 23, 2012 Filing 214 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #199 MOTION to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines with opposition filed by Maryland Co L L C. (aty,Daschbach, Emma)
January 20, 2012 Filing 213 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: 212 MOTION to Strike #204 Amended Complaint, 212 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Motion day set for 2/22/2012 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Alexander, E)
January 19, 2012 Filing 212 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Exxon Mobil Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as 212 Motion to Strike electronically filed without selecting all reliefs requested in motion. (crt,Alexander, E)
January 19, 2012 Filing 212 MOTION to Strike #204 Amended Complaint by Exxon Mobil Corp. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(aty,Rolen-Ogden, April) Modified text on 1/20/2012. (Alexander, E)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting #210 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Bradley Duane Cousins for Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/12/2012. (crt,Kennedy, T)
January 11, 2012 Filing 210 MOTION for Bradley D. Cousins to Enroll as Counsel by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Price, Andrea)
January 11, 2012 Re-Set Deadlines/Hearings: Jury Trial set for 8/20/2012 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Richard T Haik Sr. Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2012 09:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard T Haik Sr. Written Discovery propounded in state court due by 7/15/2011. Daubert Motions due by 5/21/2012. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 3/16/2012. Discovery deadline 12/31/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 4/20/2012. Electronic Exhibits due by 8/10/2012. Exhibit List due by 7/1/2011. Expert Depositions due by 4/20/2012. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 9/1/2011. Motions in Limine due by 5/29/2012. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 1/17/2012. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 6/20/2012. Pretrial Order due by 6/29/2012. Real Time glossary due by 8/10/2012. Witness List due by 7/1/2011. Initial Disclosure due by 6/1/2011. (crt,Kennedy, T)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Order granting the Motion to Continue [Doc. 205] is hereby VACATED. All previous deadlines and trial date pursuant to the Case Management Order [Doc. 98] are hereby reset. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 1/9/2012. (crt,Kennedy, T)
January 10, 2012 Filing 208 REPLY to Response to Motion re #198 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #145 MOTION for Contempt Against ExxonMobil Corp Pursuant to FRCP 37(b)(2)(A)(vii) filed by Maryland Co L L C filed by Exxon Mobil Corp. (aty,Rolen-Ogden, April) Modified to remove duplicate and excess text on 1/11/2012. (Alexander, E)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 207 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/19/2013 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Richard T Haik Sr. Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2013 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard T Haik Sr. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 10/1/2012. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 10/1/2012. Discovery deadline 10/31/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2012. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 10/31/2012. Discovery II due by 11/30/2012. Daubert Motions due by 12/10/2012. Motions in Limine due by 1/9/2013. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 1/9/2013. Expert Depositions due by 1/9/2013. Pretrial Order due by 1/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Attachments to scheduling order, #2 real time)(crt,Brazell, G)
January 9, 2012 Filing 206 MINUTE ENTRY: Jury Trial set for 2/19/2013 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Richard T Haik Sr. Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2013 10:00 AM before Judge Richard T Haik Sr. This is a Jury Trial special fixing for a two week period starting 2/19/2013 through the week beginning 2/25/2013. All deadlines are reset in accordance with the Scheduling Order which shall issue herein. (crt,Kennedy, T)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 205 VACATED. ORDER granting #199 Motion to Continue and all deadline are continued and this matter will be reset for trial with a new scheduling order. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 12/21/2011. (crt,Kennedy, T) Modified to reflect document VACATED on 1/11/2012. See document #209 Order. (Kennedy, T)
January 5, 2012 Filing 204 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDING COMPLAINT against Alistar Corp, Antonette Tilly Arnold, Isaac Arnold, III, Isaac Arnold, Jr, Robert Tilly Arnold, Arnold Corp, Walter S Baker, Jr, Robert J Barnhart, Alison R Baumann, Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P, Katherine A Cattanach, Cockspur Inc, Harry H Cullen, Jr, Harry H Cullen, Melinda Jovita Cullen, Robert Ludwig Cullen, Roy Walter Cullen, Roy H Cullen, Ener Corp, Exxon Mobil Corp, Jeffrey Michael Grieff, Carroll R Hochner, Gregory R Hovas, Francis P King, Legacy Trust Co N A, Cornelia Cullen Long, Martha Katherine Long, Meredith J Long, Benjamin Cullen Marshall, Douglas B Marshall, III, Hugh Roy Marshall, Jr, Hugh Roy Marshall, Marshall Earth Resources Inc, Antoinette Arnold Maywald, Katherine Cullen McCord, Wilhelmina R Morian, Alisa Erin O'Leary, John Cavanaugh O'Leary, Jr, Paul Di Portanova, Margaret G Price, Quintana Minerals Corp, Corbin J Robertson, Jr, Lillie T Robertson, Stuart Bruce Robinson, Mary Hugh Arnold Scott, Russell Scott, Jr, Deborah Robinson Tom, Wilhelmina B Traylor, V Richard Viebig, Jr, Allen W Wendler, Cornelia O'Leary Zilkha filed by Maryland Co L L C.(crt,Alexander, E)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting #201 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/5/2012. (crt,Alexander, E)
January 4, 2012 Filing 202 RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to #198 Report and Recommendations by Maryland Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1 - 9)(aty,Daschbach, Emma)
December 30, 2011 Filing 201 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal per #194 Order by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(aty,Huddell, Kevin) Modified to edit lengthy text and create link to proper pleading on 1/3/2012. (Putch, A)
December 27, 2011 Filing 200 OBJECTION to #198 Report and Recommendations by Exxon Mobil Corp. Response to Objection to R&R due by 1/10/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(aty,Rolen-Ogden, April)
December 19, 2011 Filing 199 MOTION to Continue Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines with opposition by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Text of proposed order, #3 Local Rule 7.9 Certificate)(aty,Isenberg, Craig) Modified to more accurately identify motion and attachment on 12/21/2011. (Alexander, E)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #145 MOTION for Contempt Against ExxonMobil Corp Pursuant to FRCP 37(b)(2)(A)(vii) filed by Maryland Co L L C Accordingly, the undersigned recommends that the plaintiffs motion (Rec.Doc. 145) be granted in part and denied in part, with ExxonMobils lack of diligencein responding to the plaintiffs discovery requests and its delay in producingdocuments responsive to the plaintiffs requests for the production of documentsbeing sanctioned under Rule 37(b)(2)(A) but without ExxonMobils failure to obey the undersigneds orders being treated as contempt under Rule 37(b)(2)(A)(vii).Objections to R&R due by 12/30/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/13/11. Sent copy of R&R to RTH this date.(crt,Jordan, P)
December 7, 2011 Filing 197 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #145 MOTION for Contempt Against ExxonMobil Corp Pursuant to FRCP 37(b)(2)(A)(vii) filed by Exxon Mobil Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(aty,Lapeze, James)
December 7, 2011 Filing 196 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re #145 MOTION for Contempt Against ExxonMobil Corp Pursuant to FRCP 37(b)(2)(A)(vii) Per November 29, 2011 Order, Doc. No. 189 filed by Maryland Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1-8)(aty,Huddell, Kevin)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER denying as moot #159 Motion to Bifurcate RCRA Claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/5/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #157 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Having reviewed Hilcorp Energy I L P and Hilcorp Energy Co'ssubmissions regarding jurisdiction (Rec. Docs. 163 and 186), the undersigned finds that adding those entities as defendants in the lawsuit will not destroy diversity. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that, to the extent the plaintiff seeks to amend its complaint to add claims against Hilcorp Energy I L P and Hilcorp Energy Co, the motion is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, to the extent the plaintiff seeks to amend its complaint to add a RCRA claim, the motion is DENIED, without prejudice to the plaintiff's right to refile the RCRA claim in a separate lawsuit. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall submit a proposed second amended complaint that complies with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/5/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
December 1, 2011 Filing 193 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings filed for Motion hearing held on 11/29/2011 before Judge Magistrate Patrick Hanna. Court Reporter: Debbie Lowery, Telephone number 318-361-0380. Pages: 53 Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 12/27/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2012. (crt,Lowery, D)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting #190 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Richard E Sarver, Craig Isenberg, Andrea Claire Mahady-Price, Seth T Thorp for Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/1/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting #185 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Jack Brandon Stanley for Alistar Corp, Antonette Tilly Arnold, Isaac Arnold, III, Isaac Arnold, Jr, Robert Tilly Arnold, Arnold Corp, Walter S Baker, Jr, Robert J Barnhart, Alison R Baumann, Katherine A Cattanach, Cockspur Inc, Harry H Cullen, Jr, Harry H Cullen, Melinda Jovita Cullen, Robert Ludwig Cullen, Roy Walter Cullen, Roy H Cullen, Ener Corp, Jeffrey Michael Grieff, Carroll R Hochner, Gregory R Hovas, Francis P King, Legacy Trust Co N A, Cornelia Cullen Long, Martha Katherine Long, Meredith J Long, Benjamin Cullen Marshall, Douglas B Marshall, III, Hugh Roy Marshall, Jr, Hugh Roy Marshall, Marshall Earth Resources Inc, Antoinette Arnold Maywald, Katherine Cullen McCord, Wilhelmina R Morian, Alisa Erin O'Leary, John Cavanaugh O'Leary, Jr, Paul Di Portanova, Margaret G Price, Quintana Minerals Corp, Corbin J Robertson, Jr, Lillie T Robertson, Stuart Bruce Robinson, Mary Hugh Arnold Scott, Russell Scott, Jr, Deborah Robinson Tom, Wilhelmina B Traylor, V Richard Viebig, Jr, Allen W Wendler, Cornelia O'Leary Zilkha. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/30/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
November 30, 2011 Filing 190 MOTION for Richard E. Sarver, Craig Isenberg, Andrea Mahady Price, and Seth Thorp to Enroll as Counsel by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Guidry, Valerie)
November 30, 2011 Filing 186 AFFIDAVIT of Citizenship by Hilcorp Energy I L P. (aty,Guidry, Valerie)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER taking under advisement #145 Motion for Contempt Against ExxonMobil Corp Pursuant to FRCP 37(b)(2)(A)(vii) ; taking under advisement #157 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint; taking under advisement #159 Motion to Bifurcate RCRA Claims. IT IS ORDERED THAT Hilcorp Energy I L P shall file into the record, not later than Wednesday, 12/7/2011, an affidavit attesting to the citizenship of its partners. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff and ExxonMobil shall each file into the record, not later than Wednesday, 12/7/2011, a brief limited to a maximum of 5 pages in length. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/29/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
November 29, 2011 Filing 188 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: Monthly STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/29/2011. A separate order will be issued. (crt,Jordan, P)
November 29, 2011 Filing 187 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: MOTION HEARING held on 11/29/2011 re #145 MOTION for Contempt Against ExxonMobil Corp Pursuant to FRCP 37(b)(2)(A)(vii) filed by Maryland Co L L C, #157 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Maryland Co L L C, #159 MOTION to Bifurcate RCRA Claims filed by Maryland Co L L C. (Court Reporter: Debbie Lowery) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) A written ruling and order by the Court will follow.(crt,Jordan, P)
November 29, 2011 Filing 185 MOTION for Jack B. Stanley to Enroll as Counsel by Alistar Corp, Antonette Tilly Arnold, Isaac Arnold, III, Isaac Arnold, Jr, Robert Tilly Arnold, Arnold Corp, Walter S Baker, Jr, Robert J Barnhart, Alison R Baumann, Katherine A Cattanach, Cockspur Inc, Harry H Cullen, Jr, Harry H Cullen, Melinda Jovita Cullen, Robert Ludwig Cullen, Roy Walter Cullen, Roy H Cullen, Ener Corp, Jeffrey Michael Grieff, Carroll R Hochner, Gregory R Hovas, Francis P King, Legacy Trust Co N A, Cornelia Cullen Long, Martha Katherine Long, Meredith J Long, Benjamin Cullen Marshall, Douglas B Marshall, III, Hugh Roy Marshall, Jr, Hugh Roy Marshall, Marshall Earth Resources Inc, Antoinette Arnold Maywald, Katherine Cullen McCord, Wilhelmina R Morian, Alisa Erin O'Leary, John Cavanaugh O'Leary, Jr, Paul Di Portanova, Margaret G Price, Quintana Minerals Corp, Corbin J Robertson, Jr, Lillie T Robertson, Stuart Bruce Robinson, Mary Hugh Arnold Scott, Russell Scott, Jr, Deborah Robinson Tom, Wilhelmina B Traylor, V Richard Viebig, Jr, Allen W Wendler, Cornelia O'Leary Zilkha. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Gray, Patrick)
November 28, 2011 Filing 184 RESPONSE to Motion re #145 MOTION for Contempt Against ExxonMobil Corp Pursuant to FRCP 37(b)(2)(A)(vii) filed by Exxon Mobil Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A thru H, #2 Exhibits I thru O, #3 Exhibit P)(aty,Rolen-Ogden, April)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting #178 Motion to Amend/Correct #98 Order and the CMO is hereby modified to allow the FRCP 30(b)(6) deposition of Hilcorp to take place in January 2012. All other CMO deadlines are to remain in place. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/28/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
November 28, 2011 Filing 182 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re #145 MOTION for Contempt Against ExxonMobil Corp Pursuant to FRCP 37(b)(2)(A)(vii) filed by Maryland Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 2)(crt,Alexander, E)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting #177 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/28/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
November 28, 2011 Filing 180 NOTICE of Deficiency to Kevin Earl Huddell on behalf of Maryland Co L L C regarding #179 DEFICIENT ? Reply to Response to Motion. Reason: The Federal Rules of Civil Procedure do not provide for the filing of a reply brief and acceptance of such a brief is discretionary with the judge. Leave of court must be obtained before the filing of a reply brief in this case. (crt,Alexander, E)
November 23, 2011 Filing 179 DEFICIENT REPLY to Response to Motion re #159 MOTION to Bifurcate RCRA Claims filed by Maryland Co L L C. (aty,Huddell, Kevin) Modified to more accurately identify pleading and to reflect submission is deficient on 11/28/2011. (Alexander, E) Modified on 1/6/2012 to remove "?" from docket text. See #195 Order on Motion. (Alexander, E)
November 22, 2011 Filing 178 MOTION to Amend/Correct #98 Order with consent by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Guidry, Valerie) Modified text on 11/23/2011. (Alexander, E)
November 22, 2011 Filing 177 MOTION for Leave to File Supp Memo in Support with consent sought but not yet obtained by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Certificate of Compliance, #3 Text of proposed order)(aty,Huddell, Kevin)
November 18, 2011 Filing 176 RESPONSE to Motion re #159 MOTION to Bifurcate RCRA Claims filed by Alistar Corp, Antonette Tilly Arnold, Isaac Arnold, III, Isaac Arnold, Jr, Robert Tilly Arnold, Arnold Corp, Walter S Baker, Jr, Robert J Barnhart, Alison R Baumann, Katherine A Cattanach, Cockspur Inc, Harry H Cullen, Jr, Harry H Cullen, Melinda Jovita Cullen, Robert Ludwig Cullen, Roy Walter Cullen, Roy H Cullen, Ener Corp, Jeffrey Michael Grieff, Carroll R Hochner, Gregory R Hovas, Francis P King, Cornelia Cullen Long, Martha Katherine Long, Meredith J Long, Benjamin Cullen Marshall, Douglas B Marshall, III, Hugh Roy Marshall, Jr, Hugh Roy Marshall, Marshall Earth Resources Inc, Antoinette Arnold Maywald, Katherine Cullen McCord, Wilhelmina R Morian, Alisa Erin O'Leary, John Cavanaugh O'Leary, Jr, Paul Di Portanova, Margaret G Price, Quintana Minerals Corp, Corbin J Robertson, Jr, Lillie T Robertson, Stuart Bruce Robinson, Mary Hugh Arnold Scott, Russell Scott, Jr, Deborah Robinson Tom, Wilhelmina B Traylor, V Richard Viebig, Jr, Cornelia O'Leary Zilkha. (aty,Mengis, Michael)
November 17, 2011 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Carmen M Rodriguez on behalf of Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P regarding #174 FILED IN ERROR Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Action taken: Modified docket entry to reflect FILED IN ERROR; Counsel refiled correct pdf of memorandum as document #175 . (crt,Keifer, K)
November 17, 2011 Filing 175 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #159 MOTION to Bifurcate RCRA Claims (Corrected Version) filed by Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P. (aty,Rodriguez, Carmen)
November 17, 2011 Filing 174 FILED IN ERROR MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #159 MOTION to Bifurcate RCRA Claims filed by Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P. (aty,Rodriguez, Carmen) Modified on 11/18/2011 to reflect Filed in Error; refiled as #175 with correct pdfs (Keifer, K).
November 14, 2011 Filing 173 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings filed for a Telephone conference held on 10/25/2011 before Magistrate Judge Patrick Hanna. Court Reporter: Debbie Lowery, Telephone number 318-361-0380. Pages: 33 Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 12/8/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2012. (crt,Lowery, D)
November 14, 2011 Filing 172 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #159 MOTION to Bifurcate RCRA Claims filed by Exxon Mobil Corp, Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. (aty,Guidry, Valerie)
November 7, 2011 Filing 171 REPLY to Response to Motion re #157 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Maryland Co L L C. (crt,Alexander, E)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting #167 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/7/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
November 7, 2011 Filing 169 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #157 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P, Exxon Mobil Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(crt,Alexander, E)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting #165 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Supplemental and Amending Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/7/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
November 4, 2011 Filing 167 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Reply with consent sought but not yet obtained by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(aty,Huddell, Kevin) Modified to remove duplicate and excess text on 11/7/2011. (Alexander, E)
November 3, 2011 Filing 166 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P, Exxon Mobil Corp re #165 Motion for Leave to File,. (aty,Rolen-Ogden, April)
November 3, 2011 Filing 165 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Supplemental and Amending Complaint with consent sought but not yet obtained by Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P, Exxon Mobil Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Supplemental Opposition, #2 Exhibit "A")(aty,Rolen-Ogden, April)
November 1, 2011 Filing 164 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #157 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P, Exxon Mobil Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1")(aty,Rolen-Ogden, April)
October 28, 2011 Filing 163 RESPONSE Regarding Citizenship by Hilcorp Energy I L P re #162 Order. (aty,Guidry, Valerie) Modified text on 11/1/2011. (Alexander, E)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MINUTES, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #159 MOTION to Bifurcate RCRA Claims, #145 MOTION for Contempt Against ExxonMobil Corp Pursuant to FRCP 37(b)(2)(A)(vii) : Motion day set for 11/29/2011 01:30 PM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Hilcorp Energy I, LP shall file a memorandum containing information concerning the citizenship of every partner of that entity not later than the close of business on 10/28/2011. IT IS ORDERED that the defendants shall advise the undersigned, not later than the close of business on 10/28/2011, if they oppose the plaintiffs motion for leave to amend the complaint. (Compliance Deadline set for 10/28/2011.) IT IS ORDERED that Exxon shall promptly complete its search for policy and procedure documents and shall produce all such documents to the plaintiff not later than the close of business on November 8, 2011 (Second Compliance Deadline set for 11/8/2011.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/26/2011. (crt,Davenport, M)
October 25, 2011 Filing 161 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/25/2011. (crt,Davenport, M)
October 25, 2011 Filing 160 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #159 MOTION to Bifurcate RCRA Claims. Motion day set for 12/15/2011 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Richard T Haik Sr. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 24, 2011 Filing 159 MOTION to Bifurcate RCRA Claims by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Huddell, Kevin)
October 24, 2011 Filing 158 NOTICE of Deficiency to Kevin Earl Huddell on behalf of Maryland Co L L C regarding #157 DEFICIENT ? MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Reason: You do not indicate whether opposing counsel consent to the granting of this ex parte motion. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 21, 2011 Filing 157 DEFICIENT MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Huddell, Kevin) Modified on 10/24/2011 to remove consent language not reflected in text of pleading and to reflect submission is deficient. (Alexander, E) Modified on 11/8/2011 to remove "?" from docket text. See #164 Memorandum in Opposition. (Alexander, E)
October 18, 2011 Reset Deadlines: Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 10/21/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #155 Motion to Amend/Correct re #98 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/18/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 14, 2011 Filing 155 MOTION to Amend/Correct re #98 Case Management Order with consent by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Certificate, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Guidry, Valerie) Modified document linkage on 10/18/2011. (Alexander, E)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER re #145 MOTION for Contempt Against ExxonMobil Corp Pursuant to FRCP 37(b)(2)(A)(vii) filed by Maryland Co L L C. IT IS ORDERED that Exxons deadline for responding to the pending contempt motion (Rec. Doc. 145) is SUSPENDED; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Exxons counsel will report on the status of the ongoing document production at the next regularly scheduled status conference on October 25, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/11/2011. (crt,Kennedy, T)
October 11, 2011 Filing 153 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 10/11/2011. Mr. McNeal reported that Exxon has produced additional documents since themotion for contempt was filed, and he further reported that an ongoing effort is being made to locate additional documents responsive to the plaintiffs discovery requests.Mr. McNeal requested additional time to file Exxons response to the contemptmotion, and the plaintiff had no objection to that request. Accordingly, no action willbe taken on the contempt motion at this time, and the deadline for Exxon to respondto the contempt motion will be suspended pending a report on the status of thedocument production to be delivered by Exxons counsel at the next regularlyscheduled status conference on October 25, 2011. A separate order will be issued (crt,Jordan, P)
September 30, 2011 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 10/15/2011. See Order signed this date.(crt,Jordan, P)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #151 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/30/11. (crt,Jordan, P)
September 29, 2011 Filing 151 MOTION to Amend/Correct #98 Case Management Order with consent by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Certificate, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Guidry, Valerie) Modified document linkage on 9/29/2011.(Alexander, E)
September 28, 2011 Filing 150 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding #145 MOTION for Contempt Against ExxonMobil Corp Pursuant to FRCP 37(b)(2)(A)(vii). Motion day set for 11/23/2011 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #145 Motion for Contempt against Exxon MobilCorp will be resolved without oral argument. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Exxon's opposition brief will be filed not more than 14 after the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no reply brief will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/28/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER denying as moot #122 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/28/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 27, 2011 Filing 147 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: MONTHLY STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/27/2011. A separate order will follow. (Court Reporter: Debbie Lowery) (crt,Jordan, P)
September 27, 2011 Filing 146 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: MOTION HEARING and monthly Status Conference held on 9/27/2011 re #122 MOTION to Compel Burlington Oil & Gas Resources Company LP filed by Maryland Co L L C. A written ruling and order by the Court will follow. (Court Reporter: Debbie Lowery) (crt,Jordan, P)
September 26, 2011 Filing 145 MOTION for Contempt Against ExxonMobil Corp Pursuant to FRCP 37(b)(2)(A)(vii) by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Certificate re efforts to resolve-LR 37.1, #7 Exhibit 1)(aty,Huddell, Kevin) Modified to more accurately identify motion on 9/28/2011. (Alexander, E)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER denying as moot 121 Motion to Compel Quintana Defendants' and Exxon's Responses to May 13, 2011 Discovery Requests; denying as 121 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/31/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER denying as moot 123 Motion to Compel Quintana Defendants' Responses to Discovery Requests; denying as moot 123 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/31/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
August 30, 2011 Filing 142 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: TELEPHONESTATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/30/2011. The plaintiff will be making its expert disclosures today. Mr. Jones also reported that a mediation is scheduled for September 13, with John Perry as themediator. Mr. Jones also addressed the upcoming deadline for amending thepleadings, advising that the plaintiff does not anticipate adding additional parties butmay, if the mediation is unsuccessful, add additional causes of action. For thatreason, he would prefer that an in-person conference be held on the Septemberhearing/status report date. As that date approaches, the parties will advise if theSeptember conference should be held in chambers or on the record. (crt,Jordan, P)
August 24, 2011 Filing 141 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re #66 MOTION to Compel Burlington's Corporate Deposition filed by Maryland Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 2)(crt,Alexander, E)
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #139 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/24/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
August 23, 2011 Filing 139 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Burlington Oil & Gas Resources Company LP with consent sought but not yet obtained by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibits 1, #3 Exhibits 2, #4 Certificate of Consent Sought Pursuant to Local Rule 7.4.1(W), #5 Text of proposed order)(aty,Huddell, Kevin) Modified to remove excess text on 8/24/2011. (Alexander, E)
August 19, 2011 Filing 138 NOTICE of Deficiency to Kevin Earl Huddell on behalf of Maryland Co L L C regarding #137 DEFICIENT ? Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion. Reason: Leave of court is required for the filing of this supplemental pleading. (crt,Alexander, E)
August 19, 2011 Filing 137 DEFICIENT SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support re #122 MOTION to Compel Burlington Oil & Gas Resources Company LP filed by Maryland Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1, #2 Exhibits 2)(aty,Huddell, Kevin) Modified on 8/19/2011 to reflect submission is deficient. (Alexander, E) Modified on 8/25/2011 to remove "?" from docket text. Pleading resubmitted in its entirety and electronically filed as an attachment to #139 Motion for Leave to File. (Alexander, E)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #124 motion to expedite. Maryland Company's motion to expedite consideration of its motion to compel Burlington Oil & Gas Resources Company LP [Rec. Doc. 121] and to compel the Quintana Defendants and Exxon's responses to the May 13, 2011 discovery requests [Rec. Doc. 123] is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 08-15-11. (crt,Nations, Sue)
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #132 Motion to Enroll Michael Mengis as additional counsel of record for the Quintana defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 08/10/2011. (jud,Hanna, Patrick)
August 9, 2011 Filing 134 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 121 MOTION to Compel Quintana Defendants' and Exxon's Responses to May 13, 2011 Discovery Requests, 121 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Exxon Mobil Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(aty,Rolen-Ogden, April) Modified document linkage on 8/9/2011. (Alexander, E)
August 3, 2011 Filing 133 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joshua A Norris (aty,Norris, Joshua)
July 27, 2011 Filing 132 MOTION for Michael W. Mengis to Enroll as Counsel by Alistar Corp, Antonette Tilly Arnold, Isaac Arnold, III, Isaac Arnold, Jr, Robert Tilly Arnold, Arnold Corp, Walter S Baker, Jr, Robert J Barnhart, Alison R Baumann, Katherine A Cattanach, Cockspur Inc, Harry H Cullen, Jr, Harry H Cullen, Melinda Jovita Cullen, Robert Ludwig Cullen, Roy Walter Cullen, Roy H Cullen, Ener Corp, Jeffrey Michael Grieff, Carroll R Hochner, Gregory R Hovas, Francis P King, Legacy Trust Co N A, Cornelia Cullen Long, Martha Katherine Long, Meredith J Long, Benjamin Cullen Marshall, Douglas B Marshall, III, Hugh Roy Marshall, Jr, Hugh Roy Marshall, Marshall Earth Resources Inc, Antoinette Arnold Maywald, Katherine Cullen McCord, Wilhelmina R Morian, Alisa Erin O'Leary, John Cavanaugh O'Leary, Jr, Paul Di Portanova, Margaret G Price, Quintana Minerals Corp, Corbin J Robertson, Jr, Lillie T Robertson, Stuart Bruce Robinson, Mary Hugh Arnold Scott, Russell Scott, Jr, Deborah Robinson Tom, Wilhelmina B Traylor, V Richard Viebig, Jr, Allen W Wendler, Cornelia O'Leary Zilkha. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Gray, Patrick)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #128 Motion for J. Bradley Duhe and David K. McCrory to Enroll as Counsel for Hilcorp Energy Co and Hilcorp Energy I L P. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 7/27/2011. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #41 Motion to Compel Exxon Mobil's Discovery Responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 7/26/2011. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 26, 2011 Filing 129 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: MOTION HEARING held on 7/26/2011 re #41 First MOTION to Compel Exxon Mobil's Discovery Responses filed by Maryland Co L L C, STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/26/2011. A written ruling and order by the Court will follow. (Court Reporter: Cathleen Marquardt) (crt,Jordan, P)
July 25, 2011 Filing 128 MOTION for J. Bradley Duhe and David K. McCrory to Enroll as Counsel by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(aty,Hebert, Paul) Modified on 7/26/2011 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
July 25, 2011 Filing 127 NOTICE of Deficiency to David K McCrory on behalf of Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P regarding #126 DEFICIENT ? Notice of Appearance. Reason: This party is already represented by other counsel. Please refer to provisions under LR83.2.12 regarding appearance of other counsel to ensure compliance with this rule. A motion to enroll as co-counsel or to substitute counsel (signed by the current counsel of record) is required to remedy this situation. (Please also refer to LR5.7.08 regarding electronic filing of documents requiring signatures of more than one party.). (crt,Kennedy, T)
July 25, 2011 Filing 126 DEFICIENT NOTICE of Appearance by David K McCrory on behalf of Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P (aty,McCrory, David) Modified to reflect document as deficient on 7/25/2011. (Kennedy, T) Modified on 7/26/2011 to remove "?" and reflect counsel has corrected by filing #128 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record (Dauterive, C).
July 20, 2011 Reset Deadlines as to #122 MOTION to Compel Burlington Oil & Gas Resources Company LP, 123 MOTION to Compel Quintana Defendants' Responses to Discovery Requests, 123 MOTION for Attorney Fees, 121 MOTION to Compel Quintana Defendants' and Exxon's Responses to May 13, 2011 Discovery Requests, 121 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion day set for 8/30/2011 01:30 PM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Alexander, E)
July 20, 2011 Filing 125 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #122 MOTION to Compel Burlington Oil & Gas Resources Company LP, 121 MOTION to Compel Quintana Defendants' and Exxon's Responses to May 13, 2011 Discovery Requests, 121 MOTION for Attorney Fees, 123 MOTION to Compel Quintana Defendants' Responses to Discovery Requests, 123 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion day set for 8/24/2011 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Alexander, E)
July 19, 2011 Filing 123 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as 123 Motion to Compel electronically filed without selecting all reliefs requested in motion. (crt,Alexander, E)
July 19, 2011 Filing 121 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as 121 Motion to Compel electronically filed without selecting all reliefs requested in motion. (crt,Alexander, E)
July 19, 2011 Filing 124 MOTION to Expedite consideration of #122 MOTION to Compel Burlington Oil & Gas Resources Company LP, 121 MOTION to Compel Quintana Defendants' and Exxon's Responses to May 13, 2011 Discovery Requests, [ 121 Motion for Attorney Fees, 123 MOTION to Compel Quintana Defendants' Responses to Discovery Requests, 123 Motion for Attorney Fees by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Huddell, Kevin) Modified document linkage on 7/20/2011. (Alexander, E)
July 19, 2011 Filing 123 MOTION to Compel Quintana Defendants' Responses to Discovery Requests by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibits 1-3, #3 Exhibits 4-5, #4 Exhibits 6-8, #5 Text of proposed order, #6 Certificate re efforts to resolve-LR 37.1)(aty,Huddell, Kevin)
July 19, 2011 Filing 122 MOTION to Compel Burlington Oil & Gas Resources Company LP by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibits 1, #3 Exhibits 2-3, #4 Exhibits 4-6, #5 Text of proposed order, #6 Certificate re efforts to resolve-LR 37.1)(aty,Huddell, Kevin)
July 19, 2011 Filing 121 MOTION to Compel Quintana Defendants' and Exxon's Responses to May 13, 2011 Discovery Requests by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibits 1 - 3, #3 Text of proposed order, #4 Certificate re efforts to resolve-LR 37.1)(aty,Huddell, Kevin)
July 18, 2011 Filing 120 RESPONSE to Objections to Proposed Order by Maryland Co L L C re #117 Response and Objections . (aty,Huddell, Kevin) Modified text on 7/18/2011. (Alexander, E)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER re #118 Telephone Conference concerning the use of documents at the plaintiff's upcoming corporate deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 7/15/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
July 13, 2011 Filing 118 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/13/2011. The issues raised by Mr. Hebert and Mr. Jones were discussed in detail. A separate order will follow. (crt,Jordan, P)
July 13, 2011 Filing 117 RESPONSE and Objections by Exxon Mobil Corp re #115 Proposed Order/Judgment Submitted by Plaintiff on Motion to Compel filed against Exxon. (aty,Rolen-Ogden, April)
July 12, 2011 Filing 116 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings filed for Hearing held on 06/28/2011 before Judge Patrick J. Hanna. Court Reporter LaRae E. Bourque, Telephone number (337)593-5221. Pages: 1 - 44 Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. Redaction Request due 8/5/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2011. (crt,Bourque, LaRae)
July 8, 2011 Filing 115 PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT by Maryland Co L L C re #41 Motion to Compel,. (aty,Huddell, Kevin)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 FIRST AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Amendment to #98 Order. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 12/30/2011. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 10/1/2011. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 11/30/2011. All other provisions of the original Case Management Order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/28/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #110 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Jason P Bergeron for Exxon Mobil Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/29/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #99 Motion to Extend Deadline to Amend/Add Parties ; granting #100 Motion to Amend/Correct #98 Case Management Order. In connection with the Court's continuing consideration of the plaintiff's #41 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, the plaintiff shall, not later than Friday, 7/8/2011, submit a proposed order ruling on that motion, and Exxon Mobil shall have until 7/13/2011 to submit objections and/or proposed revisions to the proposed order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/28/20111. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 28, 2011 Filing 111 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 6/28/2011. A written ruling and order by the Court will follow. (Court Reporter: LaRae Bourque) (crt,Jordan, P)
June 28, 2011 Filing 110 MOTION for Jason P. Bergeron to Enroll as Counsel (Additional Counsel) by Exxon Mobil Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Rolen-Ogden, April)
June 27, 2011 NOTICE of Corrective Action to J Bradley Duhe on behalf of Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P regarding #107 Notice (Other), #108 Notice (Other), #106 Notice (Other). Action taken: Modified text of entry to reflect electronically filed in error. Counsel is reminded of Local Rule 26.5 and FRCP5(d); local and federal rules do not allow routine filing of discovery, including disclosures under Rule 26(a)(1) or (2). No further action on part of counsel is required. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 27, 2011 Filing 108 ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN ERROR. NOTICE by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P of Intent to Serve Subpoena on Pace Analytical Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Subpoena, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit B)(aty,Duhe, J) Modified to remove duplicate and excess text and to reflect filed in error on 6/28/2011. (Alexander, E)
June 27, 2011 Filing 107 ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN ERROR. NOTICE by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P of Intent to Serve Subpoena on ICON Environmental Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Subpoena, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit B)(aty,Duhe, J) Modified to remove duplicate and excess text and to reflect filed in error on 6/28/2011. (Alexander, E)
June 27, 2011 Filing 106 ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN ERROR. NOTICE by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P of Intent to Serve Subpoena - Sherry Laboratories (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Subpoena, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit B)(aty,Duhe, J) Modified to remove duplicate and excess text and to reflect filed in error on 6/28/2011. (Alexander, E)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT #100 MOTION to Amend/Correct #98 Case Management Order with opposition filed by Hilcorp Energy I L P, Hilcorp Energy Co will be taken up at the hearing on 6/28/2011 1:30 PM. Motion day set for 6/28/2011 01:30 PM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/24/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 24, 2011 Filing 105 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings filed for Hearing held on 06/08/2011 before Judge Patrick J. Hanna. Court Reporter LaRae E. Bourque, Telephone number (337)593-5221. Pages: 1 - 56 Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. Redaction Request due 7/18/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2011. (crt,Bourque, LaRae)
June 23, 2011 Filing 104 ANSWER to #91 Third Party Complaint by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P.(aty,Guidry, Valerie)
June 23, 2011 Filing 103 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. (aty,Guidry, Valerie)
June 23, 2011 Filing 102 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Certificate filed by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P regarding #100 MOTION to Amend/Correct #98 Case Management Order. (aty,Hebert, Paul)
June 22, 2011 Filing 101 NOTICE of Deficiency to Paul J Hebert on behalf of Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P regarding #100 DEFICIENT ? MOTION to Amend/Correct #98 Case Management Order. Reason: You do not indicate whether opposing counsel consent to the granting of this ex parte motion. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 21, 2011 Filing 100 MOTION to Amend/Correct re #98 Case Management Order with opposition by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Exhibits, #3 Exhibits, #4 Text of proposed order)(aty,Hebert, Paul) Modified to more accurately identify motion and to reflect submission is deficient on 6/22/2011. (Alexander, E) Modified on 6/23/2011 to remove deficiency status and to reflect motion is opposed. See #102 Corrective Document. (Alexander, E)
June 21, 2011 Filing 99 MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Deadline to Amend/Add Parties with consent sought but not yet obtained by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance with Local Rules 7.4.1 and 7.9(W), #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Huddell, Kevin) Modified text on 6/22/2011. (Alexander, E)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/20/2012 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Richard T Haik Sr. Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2012 09:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard T Haik Sr. Written Discovery propounded in state court due by 7/15/2011. Daubert Motions due by 5/21/2012. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 3/16/2012. Discovery deadline 12/31/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 4/20/2012. Electronic Exhibits due by 8/10/2012. Exhibit List due by 7/1/2011. Expert Depositions due by 4/20/2012. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 9/1/2011. Motions in Limine due by 5/29/2012. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 1/17/2012. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 6/20/2012. Pretrial Order due by 6/29/2012. Real Time glossary due by 8/10/2012. Witness List due by 7/1/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/14/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #94 Motion to Expedite; denying as moot 93 Motion to Quash; denying as moot 93 Motion for Protective Order; granting 87 Motion to Expedite; granting 87 Motion for Hearing. Exxon Mobil shall complete its responses to the requests for production of documents and the admissions as discussed in open court prior to the next hearing on 6/28/2011. A separate Case Management Order will issue. Any objections to the Case Management Order shall be filed in the record as a "Motion for Modification of CMO" no later than 6/21/2011 and taken up at the hearing on 6/28/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/8/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 8, 2011 Filing 96 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: MOTION HEARING held on 6/8/2011 re 87 MOTION for Hearing re #41 First MOTION to Compel Exxon Mobil's Discovery Responses filed by Maryland Co L L C, 93 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Hilcorp Energy I L P, Hilcorp Energy Co, 87 MOTION to Expedite consideration of #41 First MOTION to Compel Exxon Mobil's Discovery Responses filed by Maryland Co L L C, #41 First MOTION to Compel Exxon Mobil's Discovery Responses filed by Maryland Co L L C, 93 MOTION to Quash filed by Hilcorp Energy I L P, Hilcorp Energy Co, #94 MOTION to Expedite consideration of 93 MOTION to Quash filed by Hilcorp Energy I L P, Hilcorp Energy Co. A written ruling and order by the Court will follow. (Court Reporter: LaRae Bourque) (crt,Jordan, P)
June 7, 2011 Filing 93 MOTION for Protective Order by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as 93 Motion to Quash electronically filed without selecting all reliefs requested in motion. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 7, 2011 Filing 95 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 93 MOTION to Quash filed by Maryland Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-15)(aty,Huddell, Kevin) Modified to remove duplicate text on 6/8/2011. (Alexander, E)
June 7, 2011 Filing 94 MOTION to Expedite consideration of 93 MOTION to Quash, 93 Motion for Protective Order by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Hebert, Paul) Modified document linkage on 6/8/2011. (Alexander, E)
June 7, 2011 Filing 93 MOTION to Quash by Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibits, #3 Exhibits, #4 Text of proposed order)(aty,Hebert, Paul)
June 6, 2011 Filing 92 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 3, 2011 Filing 91 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Hilcorp Energy Co, Hilcorp Energy I L P filed by Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P.(crt,Alexander, E)
June 3, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 6/8/2011 10:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. Per rec doc 90 (crt,Davenport, M)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: The court has been apprised that the parties have not timely submitted a proposed CMO for execution by the court in violation of this court's order. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that lead counsel for all parties shall appear and show cause why they should not be held in contempt and/or sanctioned on June 8, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that lead counsel SHALL CONFER in a manner OTHER THAN email correspondence and complete the proposed CMO on or before that date, and to the extent there are any SPECIFIC areas of disagreement, they will be briefed to the court for submission on June 8 at which time a CMO will be executed by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 06/03/2011.(jud,Hanna, Patrick)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #85 Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 06/03/2011. (jud,Hanna, Patrick)
May 27, 2011 Filing 88 LETTER dated 5/27/2011 from Gary J Russo to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna regarding Case Management Order. (crt,Alexander, E)
May 25, 2011 Filing 87 MOTION for Hearing re #41 First MOTION to Compel Exxon Mobil's Discovery Responses by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as 87 Motion to Expedite electronically filed without selecting all reliefs requested in motion. (crt,Alexander, E)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ELECTRONIC ORDER: There will be no May hearing on pending motions. Therefore, no hearing will be held on Tuesday, May 31, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Hanna on May 23, 2011. (crt,David, L)
May 23, 2011 Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint with consent by Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(aty,Russo, Gary) Modified to remove excess text on 5/24/2011. (Alexander, E)
May 9, 2011 Filing 84 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings filed for Hearing held on 04/27/2011 before Judge Patrick J. Hanna. Court Reporter LaRae E. Bourque, Telephone number (337)593-5221. Pages: 1 - 60 Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. Redaction Request due 6/3/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2011. (crt,Bourque, LaRae)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER re #62 MOTION to Continue Trial and Scheduling Order Deadlines with opposition MOTION for Scheduling Conference re #43 Scheduling Order - Haik. See #82 Order of Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 4/27/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER deferring ruling on #41 Motion to Compel Exxon Mobil's Discovery Responses; granting #62 Motion to Continue Trial and Scheduling Order Deadlines; granting #62 Motion for Scheduling Conference; mooting #66 Motion to Compel Burlington's Corporate Deposition; granting 67 Motion to Continue Trial Date and All Deadlines in Current Scheduling Order; granting 67 Motion for Hearing; granting 67 Motion Adopting #62 Motion to Continue Trial and Scheduling Order Deadlines, Motion for Scheduling Conference; mooting #68 Motion to Compel Depositions of Quintana Corporate Defendants and Former Quintana Petroleum Directors. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order for the courts approval, not later than 5/31/2011, which will incorporate the deadlines set forth as numbered items 1 through 19. Compliance Deadline set for 5/31/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 4/28/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
April 27, 2011 Filing 81 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: MOTION HEARING held on 4/27/2011 re #68 MOTION to Compel Depositions of Quintana Corporate Defendants and Former Quintana Petroleum Directors filed by Maryland Co L L C, 67 MOTION for Hearing MOTION Adopting #62 Motion to Continue Trial and Scheduling Order Deadlines, Motion for Scheduling Conference filed by Exxon Mobil Corp, #66 MOTION to Compel Burlington's Corporate Deposition filed by Maryland Co L L C, 67 MOTION to Continue Trial Date and All Deadlines in Current Scheduling Order with opposition filed by Exxon Mobil Corp, #62 MOTION to Continue Trial and Scheduling Order Deadlines with opposition MOTION for Scheduling Conference re #43 Scheduling Order - Haik,,, filed by Martha Katherine Long, Jeffrey Michael Grieff, Douglas B Marshall, III, Katherine Cullen McCord, Gregory R Hovas, Walter S Baker, Jr, Ener Corp, John Cavanaugh O'Leary, Jr, Alison R Baumann, Wilhelmina R Morian, Melinda Jovita Cullen, Antonette Tilly Arnold, Allen W Wendler, Deborah Robinson Tom, Meredith J Long, Francis P King, Alisa Erin O'Leary, Legacy Trust Co N A, Robert Ludwig Cullen, Roy H Cullen, Katherine A Cattanach, Robert Tilly Arnold, Harry H Cullen, Cockspur Inc, Mary Hugh Arnold Scott, Arnold Corp, Lillie T Robertson, Hugh Roy Marshall, Jr, Margaret G Price, Cornelia O'Leary Zilkha, V Richard Viebig, Jr, Isaac Arnold, III, Carroll R Hochner, Alistar Corp, Russell Scott, Jr, Wilhelmina B Traylor, Robert J Barnhart, Hugh Roy Marshall, Benjamin Cullen Marshall, Paul Di Portanova, Roy Walter Cullen, Isaac Arnold, Jr, Harry H Cullen, Jr, Quintana Minerals Corp, Cornelia Cullen Long, Stuart Bruce Robinson, Antoinette Arnold Maywald, Marshall Earth Resources Inc, Corbin J Robertson, Jr, #41 First MOTION to Compel Exxon Mobil's Discovery Responses filed by Maryland Co L L C. A written ruling and order by the Court will follow. (Court Reporter: LaRae Bourque) (crt,Jordan, P)
April 26, 2011 Filing 80 JURISDICTIONAL Amount Review Ruling. The court finds the requisite jurisdictional amount has been established. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 04/26/11. (crt,Yocum, M)
April 25, 2011 Filing 79 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Table of Contents and Table of Authorities filed by Maryland Co L L C regarding #76 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,. (aty,Huddell, Kevin)
April 25, 2011 Filing 78 NOTICE of Deficiency to Kevin Earl Huddell on behalf of Maryland Co L L C regarding #76 DEFICIENT ? Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Reason: A table of contents and table of cases, statutes and other authorities is required for a brief which exceeds ten pages. Please see LR7.8 for specific requirements regarding table of contents. (crt,Yocum, M)
April 21, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 67 MOTION for Hearing MOTION Adopting #62 Motion to Continue Trial and Scheduling Order Deadlines, Motion for Scheduling Conference, 67 MOTION to Continue Trial Date and All Deadlines in Current Scheduling Order with opposition, #68 MOTION to Compel Depositions of Quintana Corporate Defendants and Former Quintana Petroleum Directors. Motion day set for 4/27/2011 01:30 PM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. See Electronic Order 74 and 75 (crt,Jordan, P)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ELECTRONIC ORDER: All matters set on the docket for Wednesday, April 27, 2011, shall be heard at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Hanna on April 21, 2011. (crt,David, L)
April 21, 2011 Filing 76 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 67 MOTION to Continue Trial Date and All Deadlines in Current Scheduling Order with opposition filed by Maryland Co L L C. (aty,Huddell, Kevin) Modified text to indicate pleading submitted is deficient on 4/25/2011 (Yocum, M). Modified text to remove deficient status on 4/26/2011. See #79 Corrective Document for Table of Contents/Authorities (Yocum, M).
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #70 Motion to Expedite consideration of motions to compel corporate depositions of Burlington Resources and Quintana. These motions will be taken up on Wednesday, April 27, 1011 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 04/21/2011. (jud,Hanna, Patrick)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #69 Motion to Expedite. This motion will be taken up April 27, 2011 at 1:30 p.m. See this court's order-Doc. 64. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 04/21/2011. (jud,Hanna, Patrick)
April 18, 2011 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #70 MOTION to Expedite consideration of #68 MOTION to Compel Depositions of Quintana Corporate Defendants and Former Quintana Petroleum Directors, #66 MOTION to Compel Burlington's Corporate Deposition filed by Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(aty,Russo, Gary) Modified text on 4/19/2011. (Alexander, E)
April 14, 2011 Filing 72 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #68 MOTION to Compel Depositions of Quintana Corporate Defendants and Former Quintana Petroleum Directors, #66 MOTION to Compel Burlington's Corporate Deposition. Motion day set for 5/25/2011 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Alexander, E)
April 13, 2011 Filing 67 MOTION for Hearing, MOTION Adopting #62 Motion to Continue Trial and Scheduling Order Deadlines, Motion for Scheduling Conference by Exxon Mobil Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as 67 Motion to Continue electronically filed without selecting all reliefs requested in motion. (crt,Alexander, E)
April 13, 2011 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM in Support re #62 MOTION to Continue Trial and Scheduling Order Deadlines with opposition MOTION for Scheduling Conference re #43 Scheduling Order - Haik filed by Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(aty,Russo, Gary) Modified text on 4/14/2011. (Alexander, E)
April 13, 2011 Filing 70 MOTION to Expedite consideration of #68 MOTION to Compel Depositions of Quintana Corporate Defendants and Former Quintana Petroleum Directors, #66 MOTION to Compel Burlington's Corporate Deposition by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Daschbach, Emma)
April 13, 2011 Filing 69 MOTION to Expedite consideration of 67 MOTION to Continue Trial Date and All Deadlines in Current Scheduling Order by Exxon Mobil Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(aty,Rolen-Ogden, April) Modified to remove excess text on 4/14/2011. (Alexander, E)
April 13, 2011 Filing 68 MOTION to Compel Depositions of Quintana Corporate Defendants and Former Quintana Petroleum Directors by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Certificate re efforts to resolve-LR 37.1, #3 Text of proposed order, #4 Exhibits A, #5 Exhibits B, #6 Exhibits C, #7 Exhibits D)(aty,Daschbach, Emma)
April 13, 2011 Filing 67 MOTION to Continue Trial Date and All Deadlines in Current Scheduling Order with opposition by Exxon Mobil Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(aty,Rolen-Ogden, April) Modified text on 4/14/2011. (Alexander, E)
April 13, 2011 Filing 66 MOTION to Compel Burlington's Corporate Deposition by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Certificate re efforts to resolve-LR 37.1, #3 Text of proposed order, #4 Exhibits A, #5 Exhibits B, #6 Exhibits C)(aty,Daschbach, Emma)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #45 Motion to Enroll Jacqueline Stump as Co-Counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 04/11/2011. (jud,Hanna, Patrick)
April 8, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Rule 16 Conference set for 4/27/2011 01:30 PM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. See electronic order 64 (crt,Jordan, P)
April 8, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #62 MOTION to Continue Trial and Scheduling Order Deadlines with opposition MOTION for Scheduling Conference re #43 Scheduling Order - Haik. Motion day set for 4/27/2011 01:30 PM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Jordan, P)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ELECTRONIC ORDER setting Rule 16 conference on April 27, 2011 at 1:30 at which time the Motion to Continue (Doc. 62) will be taken up along with the creation of a Case Management Order. Lead trial counsel should be present, however, in the event of an irreconcilable conflict, someone with lead trial counsel's calendar and authority to bind lead trial counsel to selected dates may attend in his/her stead. Counsel should be prepared to discuss a realistic fact discovery schedule, expert discovery schedule, regular hearing dates and have authority to enter into any stipulations necessary to effect the prompt and efficient resolution of any issues which must be resolved to move this matter to trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 04/08/2011. (jud,Hanna, Patrick)
April 4, 2011 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #62 MOTION to Continue Trial and Scheduling Order Deadlines with opposition, MOTION for Scheduling Conference re #43 Scheduling Order filed by Maryland Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(aty,Huddell, Kevin) Modified to edit text on 4/4/2011. (Putch, A)
April 1, 2011 Filing 62 MOTION to Continue Trial and Scheduling Order Deadlines with opposition, MOTION for Scheduling Conference re #43 Scheduling Order by Alistar Corp, Antonette Tilly Arnold, Isaac Arnold, III, Isaac Arnold, Jr, Robert Tilly Arnold, Arnold Corp, Walter S Baker, Jr, Robert J Barnhart, Alison R Baumann, Katherine A Cattanach, Cockspur Inc, Harry H Cullen, Jr, Harry H Cullen, Melinda Jovita Cullen, Robert Ludwig Cullen, Roy Walter Cullen, Roy H Cullen, Ener Corp, Jeffrey Michael Grieff, Carroll R Hochner, Gregory R Hovas, Francis P King, Legacy Trust Co N A, Cornelia Cullen Long, Martha Katherine Long, Meredith J Long, Benjamin Cullen Marshall, Douglas B Marshall, III, Hugh Roy Marshall, Jr, Hugh Roy Marshall, Marshall Earth Resources Inc, Antoinette Arnold Maywald, Katherine Cullen McCord, Wilhelmina R Morian, Alisa Erin O'Leary, John Cavanaugh O'Leary, Jr, Paul Di Portanova, Margaret G Price, Quintana Minerals Corp, Corbin J Robertson, Jr, Lillie T Robertson, Stuart Bruce Robinson, Mary Hugh Arnold Scott, Russell Scott, Jr, Deborah Robinson Tom, Wilhelmina B Traylor, V Richard Viebig, Jr, Allen W Wendler, Cornelia O'Leary Zilkha. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Lee, Amy) Modified to edit text on 4/4/2011. (Putch, A)
March 31, 2011 Filing 61 NOTICE by Alistar Corp, Antonette Tilly Arnold, Isaac Arnold, III, Isaac Arnold, Jr, Robert Tilly Arnold, Arnold Corp, Walter S Baker, Jr, Robert J Barnhart, Alison R Baumann, Katherine A Cattanach, Cockspur Inc, Harry H Cullen, Jr, Harry H Cullen, Melinda Jovita Cullen, Robert Ludwig Cullen, Roy Walter Cullen, Roy H Cullen, Ener Corp, Jeffrey Michael Grieff, Carroll R Hochner, Gregory R Hovas, Francis P King, Legacy Trust Co N A, Cornelia Cullen Long, Martha Katherine Long, Meredith J Long, Benjamin Cullen Marshall, Douglas B Marshall, III, Hugh Roy Marshall, Jr, Hugh Roy Marshall, Marshall Earth Resources Inc, Antoinette Arnold Maywald, Katherine Cullen McCord, Wilhelmina R Morian, Alisa Erin O'Leary, John Cavanaugh O'Leary, Jr, Paul Di Portanova, Margaret G Price, Quintana Minerals Corp, Corbin J Robertson, Jr, Lillie T Robertson, Stuart Bruce Robinson, Mary Hugh Arnold Scott, Russell Scott, Jr, Deborah Robinson Tom, Wilhelmina B Traylor, V Richard Viebig, Jr, Allen W Wendler, Cornelia O'Leary Zilkha of Citizenship in Response to Order re #57 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion for Protective Order, (aty,Lee, Amy)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #58 Motion to Substitute Party; granting #58 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Legacy Trust Co N A and Allen W Wendler. Robert C Hux, Max C Butler and Robert A Higley terminated. Added attorney Patrick W Gray, Thomas M McNamara for Allen W Wendler, Legacy Trust Co N A. Attorney Thomas J Forestier; James M Garner; Andrew J Schumacher; Darnell Bludworth and Ashley Gremillion Coker terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/31/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 30, 2011 Filing 59 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings filed for Hearing on Motions held on 3/23/11 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Hanna. Court Reporter Barbara A. Simpson, Telephone number 318.226.8003. Pages: 16. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/1/2011. (crt,Simpson, B)
March 30, 2011 Filing 58 MOTION to Substitute Party with consent, MOTION to Substitute Attorney Patrick W. Gray, Thomas M. McNamara, Amy E. A. Lee in place of James M. Garner, Darnell Bludworth, Ashley G. Coker, Thomas J. Forestier, Andrew J. Schumacher with consent by Max C Butler, Robert A Higley, Robert C Hux. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Lee, Amy)
March 23, 2011 Reset Deadlines as to #41 First MOTION to Compel Exxon Mobil's Discovery Responses. Motion day set for 4/27/2011 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the removing defendant shall notify the court within 10 days of the citizenship of decedents Joe Barnhart and Corbin J. Robertson. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ruling on #41 Motion to Compel is DEFERRED and RESET to 4/27/11 hearing date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 51 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/23/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 23, 2011 Filing 56 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: MOTION HEARING held on 3/23/2011 re 51 MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel filed by Exxon Mobil Corp, #41 First MOTION to Compel Exxon Mobil's Discovery Responses filed by Maryland Co L L C. A written ruling and order by the Court will follow. (Court Reporter: Barbara Simpson) (crt,Jordan, P)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Emma E Daschbach for Maryland Co L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/18/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 17, 2011 Filing 54 MOTION for Emma Elizabeth Antin Daschbach to Enroll as Counsel by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Huddell, Kevin)
March 15, 2011 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 51 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Maryland Co L L C. (aty,Huddell, Kevin) Modified text on 3/16/2011. (Alexander, E)
March 9, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #41 First MOTION to Compel Exxon Mobil's Discovery Responses, 51 MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Motion day set for 3/23/2011 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Jordan, P)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ELECTRONIC ORDER deferring ruling on 51 Motion for Protective Order until the hearing of the Plaintiff's motion to compel (Doc. 41) on March 23, 2011. Both motions will be taken up at the same time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 03/09/2011. (jud,Hanna, Patrick)
March 1, 2011 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #41 First MOTION to Compel Exxon Mobil's Discovery Responses filed by Exxon Mobil Corp. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pleading electronically filed as 51 Motion for Protective Order. Counsel is reminded that multiple pleadings should not be combined into one document, but should be filed separately. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 1, 2011 Filing 51 MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Exxon Mobil Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order, #2 Memorandum / Brief, #3 Exhibit A in globo (Part 1 of 2), #4 Exhibit A in globo (Part 2 of 2), #5 Exhibit B, #6 Certificate of Counsel)(aty,Rolen-Ogden, April)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Andrew Karl Jacoby for Maryland Co L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 2/28/2011. (crt,Alexander, E) Modified document linkage on 3/17/2011. (Alexander, E)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #46 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Rec.Doc. 41). To the extent the movant wishes to argue prematurity as a defense to the motion to compel, notwithstanding the fact the motion to compel had been pending in the state district court at the time of removal, they may do so at the hearing on March 23. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 02/28/2011. (jud,Hanna, Patrick)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #47 Motion to Expedite Consideration of Exxon Mobil's Motion to Strike (Rec. Doc. 46). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 02/28/2011. (jud,Hanna, Patrick)
February 28, 2011 Filing 47 MOTION to Expedite consideration of #46 MOTION to Strike #41 First MOTION to Compel Exxon Mobil's Discovery Responses by Exxon Mobil Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Rolen-Ogden, April)
February 28, 2011 Filing 46 MOTION to Strike #41 First MOTION to Compel Exxon Mobil's Discovery Responses by Exxon Mobil Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order, #2 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Rolen-Ogden, April)
February 24, 2011 Filing 45 MOTION for Jacqueline A. Stump to Enroll as Counsel by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Huddell, Kevin)
February 24, 2011 Filing 44 MOTION for Andrew K. Jacoby to Enroll as Counsel by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Huddell, Kevin)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/23/2012 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Richard T Haik Sr. Pretrial Conference set for 12/27/2011 11:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Richard T Haik Sr. Initial Disclosure due by 3/16/2011. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 3/30/2011. Rule 26 Report due by 4/13/2011. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 8/29/2011. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 8/29/2011. Discovery deadline 9/28/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 9/28/2011. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 9/28/2011. Discovery II due by 10/28/2011. Daubert Motions due by 11/7/2011. Motions in Limine due by 12/7/2011. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 12/7/2011. Expert Depositions due by 12/7/2011. Pretrial Order due by 12/20/2011. (Attachments: #1 Attachments to scheduling order, #2 real time)(crt,Brazell, G)
February 8, 2011 Filing 42 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #41 First MOTION to Compel Exxon Mobil's Discovery Responses. Motion day set for 3/23/2011 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Alexander, E)
February 7, 2011 Filing 41 First MOTION to Compel Exxon Mobil's Discovery Responses by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Certificate re efforts to resolve-LR 37.1, #3 Text of proposed order, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B)(aty,Huddell, Kevin) Modified to remove duplicate and excess text on 2/8/2011. (Alexander, E)
February 3, 2011 Filing 40 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, and Complaint by Alistar Corp, Antonette Tilly Arnold, Isaac Arnold, III, Isaac Arnold, Jr, Robert Tilly Arnold, Arnold Corp, Walter S Baker, Jr, Robert J Barnhart, Alison R Baumann, Katherine A Cattanach, Cockspur Inc, Harry H Cullen, Jr, Harry H Cullen, Melinda Jovita Cullen, Robert Ludwig Cullen, Roy Walter Cullen, Roy H Cullen, Ener Corp, Jeffrey Michael Grieff, Carroll R Hochner, Gregory R Hovas, Francis P King, Cornelia Cullen Long, Martha Katherine Long, Meredith J Long, Benjamin Cullen Marshall, Douglas B Marshall, III, Hugh Roy Marshall, Jr, Hugh Roy Marshall, Marshall Earth Resources Inc, Antoinette Arnold Maywald, Katherine Cullen McCord, Wilhelmina R Morian, Alisa Erin O'Leary, John Cavanaugh O'Leary, Jr, Paul Di Portanova, Margaret G Price, Quintana Minerals Corp, Corbin J Robertson, Jr, Lillie T Robertson, Stuart Bruce Robinson, Mary Hugh Arnold Scott, Russell Scott, Jr, Deborah Robinson Tom, Wilhelmina B Traylor, V Richard Viebig, Jr, Cornelia O'Leary Zilkha.(aty,Lee, Amy)
January 31, 2011 Filing 39 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings filed for Motions Hearing held on January 13, 2011 before Judge Richard T. Haik, Sr. Court Reporter is Mary Thompson. Her Telephone number is 337.593.5222. Pages: 1-55 Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2011. (crt,Thompson, M)
January 27, 2011 Filing 38 ANSWER to First Supplemental and Amending Complaint, (and Affirmative Defenses) by Exxon Mobil Corp.(aty,Rolen-Ogden, April) Modified text on 1/27/2011. (Alexander, E)
January 27, 2011 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint, First Supplemental and Amending Complaint, by Max C Butler, Robert A Higley, Robert C Hux.(aty,Bludworth, Darnell) Modified text on 1/27/2011. (Alexander, E)
January 25, 2011 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint, First Supplemental and Amending Complaint with Jury Demand by Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P.(aty,Donohue, Megan) Modified document linkage on 1/26/2011. (Alexander, E)
January 20, 2011 Filing 35 RULING denying #5 MOTION for More Definite Statement PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pursuant to 12(b)(6), #9 PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss Claims MOTION to Strike Claims MOTION for More Definite Statement, #10 MOTION for More Definite Statement PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6), #22 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 1/20/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Harvey Sylvanous Bartlett for Maryland Co L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/13/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
January 13, 2011 Filing 32 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Richard T Haik, Sr: denying #5 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying #5 Motion to Dismiss; denying #9 Motion to Dismiss; denying #9 Motion to Strike ; denying #9 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying #10 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying #10 Motion to Dismiss; denying #22 Motion for More Definite Statement; denying #22 Motion to Dismiss; MOTION HEARING held on 1/13/2011 re #10 MOTION for More Definite Statement PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6) filed by Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P, #5 MOTION for More Definite Statement PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pursuant to 12(b)(6) filed by Exxon Mobil Corp, #9 PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss Claims MOTION to Strike Claims MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Martha Katherine Long, Jeffrey Michael Grieff, Katherine Cullen McCord, Gregory R Hovas, Walter S Baker, Jr, Ener Corp, John Cavanaugh O'Leary, Jr, Alison R Baumann, Wilhelmina R Morian, Melinda Jovita Cullen, Antonette Tilly Arnold, Deborah Robinson Tom, Meredith J Long, Francis P King, Alisa Erin O'Leary, Robert Ludwig Cullen, Roy H Cullen, Katherine A Cattanach, Robert Tilly Arnold, Harry H Cullen, Cockspur Inc, Mary Hugh Arnold Scott, Arnold Corp, Lillie T Robertson, Hugh Roy Marshall, Jr, Margaret G Price, Cornelia O'Leary Zilkha, V Richard Viebig, Jr, Isaac Arnold, III, Carroll R Hochner, Alistar Corp, Russell Scott, Jr, Wilhelmina B Traylor, Robert J Barnhart, Hugh Roy Marshall, Benjamin Cullen Marshall, Paul Di Portanova, Roy Walter Cullen, Isaac Arnold, Jr, Harry H Cullen, Jr, Quintana Minerals Corp, Cornelia Cullen Long, Stuart Bruce Robinson, Antoinette Arnold Maywald, Marshall Earth Resources Inc, Corbin J Robertson, Jr, #22 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims of Plaintiff filed by Max C Butler, Robert A Higley, Robert C Hux. (Court Reporter: Mary Thompson) (crt,Brazell, G)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Michael A Mahone, Jr for Exxon Mobil Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/12/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
January 12, 2011 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Maryland Co L L C (aty,Huddell, Kevin)
January 12, 2011 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for More Definite Statement PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pursuant to 12(b)(6) filed by Exxon Mobil Corp. (crt,Alexander, E)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for More Definite Statement Pursuant to 12(e) and Partial Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 1/11/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
January 11, 2011 Filing 28 MOTION to Enroll Harvey S Bartlett, III as Counsel by Maryland Co L L C. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Huddell, Kevin) Modified to more accurately identify motion on 1/12/2011. (Alexander, E)
January 11, 2011 Filing 27 MINUTE ENTRY: Upon the movers' requests and being without opposition, the hearing on defendants' #22 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims of Plaintiff which is currently set for 2/17/2011, is hereby reset to 1/13/2011 09:30 AM, with oral argument, in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Richard T Haik Sr. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 1/11/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
January 11, 2011 Filing 26 MOTION for Michael A. Mahone, Jr. to Enroll as Counsel by Exxon Mobil Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Lapeze, James)
January 5, 2011 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Alistar Corp served on 3/22/2010, answer due 4/12/2010; Antonette Tilly Arnold served on 3/23/2010, answer due 4/13/2010; Isaac Arnold, Jr served on 3/23/2010, answer due 4/13/2010; Walter S Baker, Jr served on 3/22/2010, answer due 4/12/2010; Alison R Baumann served on 4/12/2010, answer due 5/3/2010; Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P served on 3/22/2010, answer due 4/12/2010; Camex Inc served on 3/22/2010, answer due 4/12/2010; Katherine A Cattanach served on 3/23/2010, answer due 4/13/2010; Cockspur Inc served on 3/22/2010, answer due 4/12/2010; Harry H Cullen, Jr served on 3/22/2010, answer due 4/12/2010; Harry H Cullen served on 3/22/2010, answer due 4/12/2010; Melinda Jovita Cullen served on 3/23/2010, answer due 4/13/2010; Roy Walter Cullen served on 3/22/2010, answer due 4/12/2010; Roy H Cullen served on 3/22/2010, answer due 4/12/2010; Exxon Mobil Corp served on 3/22/2010, answer due 4/12/2010; Carroll R Hochner served on 4/8/2010, answer due 4/29/2010; Gregory R Hovas served on 3/23/2010, answer due 4/13/2010; Francis P King served on 3/23/2010, answer due 4/13/2010; Cornelia Cullen Long served on 3/22/2010, answer due 4/12/2010; Martha Katherine Long served on 3/25/2010, answer due 4/15/2010; Benjamin Cullen Marshall served on 3/23/2010, answer due 4/13/2010; Douglas B Marshall, III served on 3/23/2010, answer due 4/13/2010; Hugh Roy Marshall served on 3/23/2010, answer due 4/13/2010; Marshall Earth Resources Inc served on 3/23/2010, answer due 4/13/2010; Antoinette Arnold Maywald served on 3/22/2010, answer due 4/12/2010; Katherine Cullen McCord served on 3/24/2010, answer due 4/14/2010; Alisa Erin O'Leary served on 3/22/2010, answer due 4/12/2010; Quintana Minerals Corp served on 3/22/2010, answer due 4/12/2010; Corbin J Robertson, Jr served on 3/22/2010, answer due 4/12/2010; Lillie T Robertson served on 3/22/2010, answer due 4/12/2010; Stuart Bruce Robinson served on 3/22/2010, answer due 4/12/2010; Mary Hugh Arnold Scott served on 3/23/2010, answer due 4/13/2010; Deborah Robinson Tom served on 3/23/2010, answer due 4/13/2010; Wilhelmina B Traylor served on 3/29/2010, answer due 4/19/2010; V Richard Viebig, Jr served on 3/22/2010, answer due 4/12/2010; Cornelia O'Leary Zilkha served on 3/24/2010, answer due 4/14/2010 filed in 16th JDC, St Mary Parish, Case Number 121,481. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: NO PDF DOCUMENT ATTACHED. SEE EXHIBIT A ATTACHED TO #25 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER FOR TEXT OF PLEADING. (crt,Alexander, E)
January 5, 2011 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alistar Corp, Antonette Tilly Arnold, Isaac Arnold, III, Isaac Arnold, Jr, Robert Tilly Arnold, Arnold Corp, Walter S Baker, Jr, Robert J Barnhart, Alison R Baumann, Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P, Max C Butler, Camex Inc, Katherine A Cattanach, Cockspur Inc, Harry H Cullen, Jr, Harry H Cullen, Melinda Jovita Cullen, Robert Ludwig Cullen, Roy Walter Cullen, Roy H Cullen, Ener Corp, Exxon Mobil Corp, Jeffrey Michael Grieff, Robert A Higley, Carroll R Hochner, Gregory R Hovas, Robert C Hux, Francis P King, Cornelia Cullen Long, Martha Katherine Long, Meredith J Long, Benjamin Cullen Marshall, Douglas B Marshall, III, Hugh Roy Marshall, Jr, Hugh Roy Marshall, Marshall Earth Resources Inc, Antoinette Arnold Maywald, Katherine Cullen McCord, Wilhelmina R Morian, Alisa Erin O'Leary, John Cavanaugh O'Leary, Jr, Paul Di Portanova, Margaret G Price, Quintana Minerals Corp, Corbin J Robertson, Jr, Lillie T Robertson, Stuart Bruce Robinson, Mary Hugh Arnold Scott, Russell Scott, Jr, Deborah Robinson Tom, Wilhelmina B Traylor, V Richard Viebig, Jr, Cornelia O'Leary Zilkha filed on 3/17/2010 in 16th JDC, St Mary Parish, Case Number 121,481. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: NO PDF DOCUMENT ATTACHED. SEE EXHIBIT A ATTACHED TO #25 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER FOR TEXT OF PLEADING. (crt,Alexander, E)
January 5, 2011 Filing 25 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Alistar Corp, Antoinette Tilly Arnold, Isaac Arnold, III, Isaac Arnold, Jr, Robert Tilly Arnold, Arnold Corp, Walter S Baker, Jr, Robert J Barnhart, Alison R Baumann, Katherine A Cattanach, Cockspur Inc, Harry H Cullen, Jr, Harry H Cullen, Melinda Jovita Cullen, Robert Ludwig Cullen, Roy Walter Cullen, Roy H Cullen, Ener Corp, Jeffrey Michael Grieff, Carroll R Hochner, Gregory R Hovas, Francis P King, Cornelia Cullen Long, Martha Katherine Long, Meredith J Long, Benjamin Cullen Marshall, Douglas B Marshall, Hugh Roy Marshall, Jr, Hugh Roy Marshall, Marshall Earth Resources Inc, Antoinette Arnold Maywald, Katherine Cullen McCord, Wilhelmina R Morian, Alisa Erin O'Leary, John Cavanaugh O'Leary, Jr, Paul Di Portanova, Margaret G Price, Quintana Minerals Corp, Corbin J Robertson, Jr, Lillie T Robertson, Stuart Bruce Robinson, Mary Hugh Arnold Scott, Russell Scott, Jr, Deborah Robinson Tom, Wilhelmina B Traylor, V Richard Viebig, Jr, Cornelia O'Leary Zilkha. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2))(aty,Lee, Amy)
January 4, 2011 Motions Transferred regarding #24 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for More Definite Statement Pursuant to 12(e) and Partial Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6) with consent. Motions referred to Richard T Haik, Sr. (crt,Alexander, E)
January 4, 2011 Filing 24 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for More Definite Statement Pursuant to 12(e) and Partial Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6) with consent by Exxon Mobil Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Lapeze, James) Modified to remove duplicate and excess text on 1/5/2011. (Alexander, E)
December 29, 2010 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #22 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims of Plaintiff. Motion day set for 2/17/2011 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Richard T Haik Sr. (crt,Alexander, E)
December 29, 2010 Filing 22 MOTION for More Definite Statement, MOTION to Dismiss Certain Claims of Plaintiff by Max C Butler, Robert A Higley, Robert C Hux. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Bludworth, Darnell)
December 28, 2010 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION for More Definite Statement PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6), #5 MOTION for More Definite Statement PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pursuant to 12(b)(6), #9 PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss Claims MOTION to Strike Claims MOTION for More Definite Statement Pursuant to 12(e) and Partial Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6) filed by Maryland Co L L C. (aty,Huddell, Kevin) Modified text on 12/29/2010. (Alexander, E)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for the appearance of Andrew J Schumacher on behalf of Max Butler, Robert Hux, Robert Higley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/17/2010. (crt,Alexander, E)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for the appearance of Thomas J Forestier on behalf of Max Butler, Robert Hux, Robert Higley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/17/2010. (crt,Alexander, E)
December 17, 2010 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P identifying Corporate Parent B R O G G P Inc, Corporate Parent B R O G L P Inc, Corporate Parent Burlington Resources Inc, Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips Co for Burlington Resources Oil 7 Gas Co L P. (aty,Donohue, Megan) Modified to identify corporate parents on 12/17/2010. (Alexander, E)
December 17, 2010 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Camex Inc. (aty,Guidry, Valerie)
December 17, 2010 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Alistar Corp, Arnold Corp, Cockspur Inc, Ener Corp, Marshall Earth Resources Inc, Quintana Minerals Corp. (aty,Lee, Amy)
December 16, 2010 Filing 15 MOTION for Andrew Schumacher to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $25, receipt number 0536-1536107) by Max C Butler, Robert A Higley, Robert C Hux. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing Schumacher, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Bludworth, Darnell)
December 16, 2010 Filing 14 MOTION for Thomas J. Forestier to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $25, receipt number 0536-1536106) by Max C Butler, Robert A Higley, Robert C Hux. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing Forestier, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Bludworth, Darnell)
December 16, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Carmen M Rodriguez on behalf of Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P (aty,Rodriguez, Carmen)
December 10, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #10 MOTION for More Definite Statement PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6). Motion day set for 1/13/2011 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Richard T Haik Sr. (crt,Alexander, E)
December 10, 2010 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #9 PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss Claims MOTION to Strike Claims MOTION for More Definite Statement. Motion day set for 1/13/2011 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Richard T Haik Sr. (crt,Alexander, E)
December 10, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION for More Definite Statement, MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to 12(b)(6) by Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Russo, Gary) Modified text on 12/10/2010. (Alexander, E)
December 9, 2010 Filing 9 PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss Claims, MOTION to Strike Claims, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Alistar Corp, Antoinette Tilly Arnold, Isaac Arnold, III, Isaac Arnold, Jr, Robert Tilly Arnold, Arnold Corp, Walter S Baker, Jr, Robert J Barnhart, Alison R Baumann, Katherine A Cattanach, Cockspur Inc, Harry H Cullen, Jr, Harry H Cullen, Melinda Jovita Cullen, Robert Ludwig Cullen, Roy Walter Cullen, Roy H Cullen, Ener Corp, Jeffrey Michael Grieff, Carroll R Hochner, Gregory R Hovas, Francis P King, Cornelia Cullen Long, Martha Katherine Long, Meredith J Long, Benjamin Cullen Marshall, Douglas B Marshall, Hugh Roy Marshall, Jr, Hugh Roy Marshall, Marshall Earth Resources Inc, Antoinette Arnold Maywald, Katherine Cullen McCord, Wilhelmina R Morian, Alisa Erin O'Leary, John Cavanaugh O'Leary, Jr, Paul Di Portanova, Margaret G Price, Quintana Minerals Corp, Corbin J Robertson, Jr, Lillie T Robertson, Stuart Bruce Robinson, Mary Hugh Arnold Scott, Russell Scott, Jr, Deborah Robinson Tom, Wilhelmina B Traylor, V Richard Viebig, Jr, Cornelia O'Leary Zilkha. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A)(aty,Lee, Amy) Modified text on 12/10/2010. (Alexander, E)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re Supplemental & Amending Complaint. Max C Butler answer due 12/30/2010; Robert A Higley answer due 12/30/2010; Robert C Hux answer due 12/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/9/2010. (crt,Alexander, E)
December 8, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #5 MOTION for More Definite Statement PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pursuant to 12(b)(6). Motion day set for 1/13/2011 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge Richard T Haik Sr. (crt,Alexander, E)
December 8, 2010 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer With Consent re Plaintiff's Supplemental & Amending Petition for Damages by Max C Butler, Robert A Higley, Robert C Hux. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of No Opposition, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Garner, James) Modified text on 12/8/2010. (Alexander, E)
December 7, 2010 Filing 5 MOTION for More Definite Statement, PARTIAL MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Pursuant to 12(b)(6) by Exxon Mobil Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Lapeze, James) Modified to remove excess text on 12/8/2010. (Alexander, E)
December 7, 2010 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Exxon Mobil Corp. (aty,Lapeze, James)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REMOVAL ORDER forwarded to all counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/7/2010. (crt,Smith, C)
December 6, 2010 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Amy Allums Lee on behalf of Alistar Corp, Arnold Corp, Cockspur Inc, Ener Corp, Marshall Earth Resources Inc, Quintana Minerals Corp. (crt,Mitchell, Pam)
November 30, 2010 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDING PETITION FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants filed by The Maryland Co LLC. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: THERE IS NO PDF IMAGE WITH THIS ENTRY. THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 (SEE DOCUMENT #497) TO DOCUMENT #1 OF THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL.(crt,Mitchell, Pam)
November 30, 2010 CASE Assigned to Judge Richard T Haik, Sr and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Mitchell, Pam)
November 30, 2010 SUMMONS Returned Executed LA Dept of Natural Resources served on 3/10/2010, answer due 3/31/2010. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: THERE IS NO PDF IMAGE WITH THIS ENTRY. THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 TO DOCUMENT #1 OF THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL. (NOTE IT WAS DIFFICULT TO DETERMINE THE DATE OF SERVICE ON THE DOCUMENT.) (crt,Mitchell, Pam)
November 30, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 16th JDC St. Mary Parish, Case Number 121,481 (Filing fee $350, receipt number 0536-1523844) filed by Martha Katherine Long, Cornelia Cullen Long, Harry H Cullen, Jr, Ener Corp, Jeffrey Michael Grieff, Alison R. Bauman, Robert J. Barnhardt, Paul Di Portanova, Roy Walter Cullen, Carroll R Hochner, Katherine Cullen McCord, Robert Tilly Arnold, Harry H Cullen, Mary Hugh Arnold Scott, Roy H Cullen, Arnold Corp, Francis P King, Benjamin Cullen Marshall, Antoinette Tilly Arnold, Cornelia O'Leary Zilkha, Deborah Robinson Tom, Alisa Erin O'Leary, Melinda Jovita Cullen, Corbin J Robertson, Jr, Isaac Arnold, III, Robert Ludwig Cullen, Gregory R Hovas, Cockspur Inc, Russell Scott, Jr, Antoinette Arnold Maywald, Douglas B Marshall, Wilhelmina B Traylor, Quintana Minerals Corp, Wilhelmina R. Morian, Isaac Arnold, Jr, Lillie T Robertson, Walter S. Baker, V. Richard Viebig, Jr, Hugh Roy Marshall, Jr, Marshall Earth Resources Inc, Meredith J Long, Margaret Price, Hugh Roy Marshall, John Cavanaugh O'Leary, Jr, Katherine A. Cattanach, Alistar Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Civil cover sheet)(aty,Lee, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maryland Co L L C v. Exxon Mobil Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen W Wendler
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Hugh Arnold Scott
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ener Corp
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Bruce Robinson
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Earth Resources Inc
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Di Portanova
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis P King
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas B Marshall, III
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret G Price
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cockspur Inc
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Jovita Cullen
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh Roy Marshall
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quintana Minerals Corp
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A Higley
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Andrew J Schumacher
Represented By: Ashley Gremillion Coker
Represented By: James M Garner
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Darnell Bludworth
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Represented By: Thomas J Forestier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carroll R Hochner
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Katherine Long
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max C Butler
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Andrew J Schumacher
Represented By: Ashley Gremillion Coker
Represented By: James M Garner
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Darnell Bludworth
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Represented By: Thomas J Forestier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilhelmina R Morian
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy H Cullen
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornelia Cullen Long
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camex Inc
Represented By: J Bradley Duhe
Represented By: Mark D Sikes
Represented By: Paul J Hebert
Represented By: Valerie Vige Guidry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alisa Erin O'Leary
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith J Long
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Robinson Tom
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Dept of Natural Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilhelmina B Traylor
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Barnhart
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh Roy Marshall, Jr
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Cullen Marshall
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C Hux
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Andrew J Schumacher
Represented By: Ashley Gremillion Coker
Represented By: James M Garner
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Darnell Bludworth
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Represented By: Thomas J Forestier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Cullen McCord
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alistar Corp
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Arnold, Jr
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corp
Represented By: Robert B McNeal
Represented By: April Leigh Rolen-Ogden
Represented By: James Edward Lapeze
Represented By: Michael A Mahone, Jr
Represented By: Jason P Bergeron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornelia O'Leary Zilkha
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry H Cullen, Jr
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Walter Cullen
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corbin J Robertson, Jr
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Michael Grieff
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lillie T Robertson
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Arnold, III
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine A Cattanach
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Tilly Arnold
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ludwig Cullen
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoinette Arnold Maywald
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cavanaugh O'Leary, Jr
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison R Baumann
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory R Hovas
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Scott, Jr
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Corp
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Richard Viebig, Jr
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry H Cullen
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Trust Co N A
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonette Tilly Arnold
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter S Baker, Jr
Represented By: Patrick W Gray
Represented By: Jack Brandon Stanley
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Amy Allums Lee
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryland Co L L C
Represented By: Kevin Earl Huddell
Represented By: Gladstone Nathaniel Jones, III
Represented By: Andrew Karl Jacoby
Represented By: Jacqueline Alexandra Stump
Represented By: Bernard E Boudreaux, Jr
Represented By: Harvey Sylvanous Bartlett
Represented By: Eberhard D Garrison
Represented By: Emma E Daschbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Co L P
Represented By: Joshua A Norris
Represented By: Michael A Chernekoff
Represented By: Carmen M Rodriguez
Represented By: William D Lampton
Represented By: Megan Donohue Breaux
Represented By: Gary J Russo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Hilcorp Energy I L P
Represented By: Andrea Claire Mahady Price
Represented By: Richard E Sarver
Represented By: Craig Isenberg
Represented By: J Bradley Duhe
Represented By: Paul J Hebert
Represented By: Seth T Thorp
Represented By: David K McCrory
Represented By: Bradley Duane Cousins
Represented By: Valerie Vige Guidry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Hilcorp Energy Co
Represented By: Andrea Claire Mahady Price
Represented By: Richard E Sarver
Represented By: Craig Isenberg
Represented By: J Bradley Duhe
Represented By: Paul J Hebert
Represented By: Seth T Thorp
Represented By: David K McCrory
Represented By: Bradley Duane Cousins
Represented By: Valerie Vige Guidry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?