Etienne v. Spanish Lake Truck & Casino Plaza L L C

Plaintiff: Esma L Etienne
Defendant: Spanish Lake Truck & Casino Plaza L L C
Case Number: 6:2011cv00213
Filed: February 7, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Iberia
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 29, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court 60 DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED, without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days of the signing of this Order, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties submit to the Court, in accordance with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a stipulation of dismissal signed by all applicable parties, together with a judgment for execution by the Court. Any motion that may be pending in this case is hereby denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 2/29/2016. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 11, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Spanish Lake Truck & Casino Plaza L L C. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 12/11/13. (crt,Jordan, P)
November 29, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 11/29/12. (crt,Kennedy, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Etienne v. Spanish Lake Truck & Casino Plaza L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spanish Lake Truck & Casino Plaza L L C
Represented By: Michael J Harig
Represented By: Dennis A Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esma L Etienne
Represented By: G Karl Bernard
Represented By: Eric L Register
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?