IN RE: Larry Doiron Inc

Plaintiff: Larry Doiron Inc
Case Number: 6:2011cv01510
Filed: August 19, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: St. Martin
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0183
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 113 Motion for Reconsideration re 112 Memorandum Ruling. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 03/19/2014. (crt,Yocum, M)
December 4, 2013 112 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING - For all of these reasons, the Court finds plaintiff's tort claims against Apache are land-based, and therefore, Louisiana state law will apply to those claims. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 12/04/13. (crt,Guidry, C)
August 21, 2013 106 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 78 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Underwriters at Lloyds London. Accordingly, Underwriters' motion to dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 8/21/13. (crt,Guidry, C)
April 24, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING - re 58 MOTION for Summary Judgment to Enforce Contractual Defense and Indemnity is hereby GRANTED; 63 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 4/24/13. (crt,Guidry, C)
October 1, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 25 Motion to Lift Limitation Stay. To proceed in state court, all claimants must sign the stipulation protecting the shipowner's rights under the Limitation Act; in this matter, Apache Corporation has not. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 10/01/12. (crt,Yocum, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: Larry Doiron Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Doiron Inc
Represented By: Jacques P DeGruy
Represented By: Georges M Legrand
Represented By: Adam P Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?