Menard v. Midwest Medical Supply Co L L C

Plaintiff: Jay Menard
Defendant: Midwest Medical Supply Co L L C
Case Number: 6:2011cv01517
Filed: August 19, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING. IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiffs motion to compel (Rec. Doc. 23) isDENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiffs motion for sanctions (Rec.Doc. 23) is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that oral argument on the motion to compel,whic h had been scheduled for November 27, 2012, is CANCELLED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall contact the undersigned, notlater than seven day after the date of this order, for the purpose of scheduling a Rule16 conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/21/12. (crt,Jordan, P)
April 17, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court VACATED. SUA SPONTE JURISDICTIONAL Briefing Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 4/17/2012. (crt,Kennedy, T) Modified to reflect document as VACATED on 4/17/2012. See document 20 Order. (Kennedy, T)
March 14, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND SUA SPONTE JURISDICTIONAL BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/14/2012. (crt,Kennedy, T)
February 7, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE JURISDICTIONAL BRIEFING ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, not later than twenty-one days after the date of this order, Midwest shall file a memorandum setting forth specific facts that support findings that the amount in controversy exc eeds the jurisdictional minimum and the parties are diverse in citizenship. These facts should be supported with summary-judgment-type evidence. The plaintiff will then be allowed seven days to respond to the defendants memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 2/7/2012. (crt,Kennedy, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Menard v. Midwest Medical Supply Co L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Medical Supply Co L L C
Represented By: William M Lawson
Represented By: Azelie Ziegler Shelby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Menard
Represented By: Charles Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?