Leger v. Offshore Staffing Services of Acadiana L L C

Plaintiff: Michael H Leger
Defendant: Offshore Staffing Services of Acadiana L L C
Case Number: 6:2011cv01539
Filed: August 23, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Presiding Judge: Tucker L Melancon
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 46:0688
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2013 164 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: Before the Court are Cross Motions for Summary Judgment on Liability (Rec Docs 121 & 129 ). For the reasons that follow the cross motions for summary judgement will be denied. The Court finds there exists genuine issues of mate rial facts as to whether or not plaintiff was negligent or contributory negligent in causing the accident by failing to properly assist the crane operator. Moreover, as to any attempted claim that Leger was Seahawk's Jones Act employee, the Cou rt finds that plaintiff has failed to offer any evidence in support of such a contention, and therefore, there exist genuine issues of material fact. Accordingly, the Cross Motion for Summary Judgment will be denied. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 11/19/2013. (crt,Putch, A)
November 18, 2013 161 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 11/18/13. (crt,Jordan, P)
February 8, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the Hanover Insurance Company's 105 MOTION to Continue Motions for Summary Judgment and Trial and for Expedited Hearing is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 7/22/2013 trial of this proceeding is UPSET and RESCHEDULED for 1/21/2014, and all remaining deadlines in the Scheduling Order issued 4/11/2012, R. 65, are extended for 180 days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the pending 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment and the 101 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Insurance Coverage filed by Michael H Leger are DENIED and may be re-filed within the extended deadline for filing dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 2/6/13. (crt,HarrisSld, C)
February 15, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 41 Report and Recommendations,and denying 27 Motion for Contempt. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Judgment be entered in favor of plaintiff, Michael H. Leger, and against defendant, Offshore Staffing Services of Acadiana, Inc. , in the principal sum of $20,910.16 as of February 15, 2012, and accruing at the rate of $25.00 per day thereafter, until paid in full, plus pre-judgment interest from the date of judicial demand to the date of entryof this Judgment and post-judgment interest from the date of entry of this Judgment at the federal rate specified in 28 U.S.C. § 1961(a).Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on February 15, 2012. (crt,Bacon, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leger v. Offshore Staffing Services of Acadiana L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael H Leger
Represented By: Craig A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offshore Staffing Services of Acadiana L L C
Represented By: Susan A Daigle
Represented By: John Daniel Rayburn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?