Demarcet v. General Nutrition Corp et al

Plaintiff: Danny Demarcet
Defendant: Chase Doe and General Nutrition Corp
Case Number: 6:2011cv01961
Filed: November 10, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Iberia
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Presiding Judge: Tucker L Melancon
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court REASONS FOR JUDGMENT granting 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 4/23/2014. (crt,Davenport, M)
February 15, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 8 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on 2/15/2012. (crt,Kennedy, T)
January 17, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 8 MOTION to Remand filed by Danny Demarcet. It is ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days of the date of the entry of this Order, the parties are to conduct remand-related discovery and are to file summary judgment typeevidence limit ed solely to the discrete and undisputed facts related to GNCs delegation of duty to its employee, Chase Lejeune, and Chase Lejeunes personal knowledge of the alleged requirement to drink a lot of liquids with the product at issue in this case. Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on 1/17/2012. (crt,Kennedy, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demarcet v. General Nutrition Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Doe
Represented By: Kevin Batik
Represented By: Charles J Foret
Represented By: Jason Roy Garrot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Nutrition Corp
Represented By: Kevin Batik
Represented By: Charles J Foret
Represented By: Jason Roy Garrot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Demarcet
Represented By: Lawrence J Centola, III
Represented By: Scott R Bickford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?