Schexnider et al v. Schexnider et al

Plaintiff: Keel Schexnider and Destiny LeBlanc
Defendant: Ken Schexnider, Kilson Schexnider, City of Kaplan, Stephen Perry, Rustin Comeaux and Keith Schexnider
Intervenor: Allstate Insurance Co
Intervenor_defendant: Keel Schexnider, Destiny LeBlanc and Kilson Schexnider
Case Number: 6:2011cv02148
Filed: December 14, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Vermilion
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment. In light of the foregoing, plaintiffs claims asserted against the City of Kaplan are DISMISSED in their entirety, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 8/8/14. (crt,Guidry, C)
May 28, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: Currently pending before the Court is 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Keith Schexnider whereby defendant seeks dismissal of all claims brought against him by plaintiffs. For the following reasons, the motion is DENIED IN PART and DEFERRED IN PART. The motion is denied to the extent it seeks dismissal of plaintiffs' claims for invasion of privacy and intentional infliction of emotional distress; the motion is deferred to the extent it seeks dismissal of plaintiffs' claim of wrongful eviction. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 5/27/2014. (crt,Putch, A)
October 10, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW: The undersigned has conducted a review of the pleadings and the record to determine whether the requirements for federal question jurisdiction are satisfied. In making that inquiry, the following chronology is pertinent. Accor dingly, the undersigned finds that the pleadings and other papers present claims arising under the Constitution, laws, or treaties of the United States, over which claims the Court shall have original jurisdiction per 28 U.S.C. §1331. Per provisions of 28 U.S.C. §1367(a), the Court has supplemental jurisdiction over the related state law claims asserted in the pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/10/2013. (crt,Putch, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schexnider et al v. Schexnider et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Schexnider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilson Schexnider
Represented By: Bryan Joseph Haydel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Kaplan
Represented By: Joy C Rabalais
Represented By: Ray Frank Lucas, III
Represented By: Erin Noel Hargrave
Represented By: John F Wilkes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rustin Comeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Schexnider
Represented By: Kenny L Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Allstate Insurance Co
Represented By: Christopher Shannon Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Keel Schexnider
Represented By: Gabe Anthony Duhon
Represented By: Dustin B Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Destiny LeBlanc
Represented By: Gabe Anthony Duhon
Represented By: Dustin B Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Kilson Schexnider
Represented By: Bryan Joseph Haydel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keel Schexnider
Represented By: Dustin B Gibson
Represented By: Gabe Anthony Duhon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Destiny LeBlanc
Represented By: Dustin B Gibson
Represented By: Gabe Anthony Duhon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?