Allen et al v. Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America Inc et al

Plaintiff: Terrence Allen and Susan Allen
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceutical Co Ltd, Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America Inc, Takeda Pharmaceuticals L L C, Takeda Pharmaceuticals International Inc, Takeda Global Research & Development Center Inc, Takeda San Diego Inc, Takeda California Inc and Takeda Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc
Case Number: 6:2012cv00064
Filed: January 17, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2014 729 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING : DEFENDANTS' RULE 59 MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL re (4348 in 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH). Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 10/27/14. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
September 5, 2014 716 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL AMENDED MEMORANDUM RULING: Defendant's Rule 50(B) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Rec. Doc. 4347 . Signed by Judge Rebecca F. Doherty on 9/5/14. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
September 2, 2014 714 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MEMORANDUM RULING: Defendants' Rule 50(B) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Rec Doc. 4347 ). Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 9/2/2014. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
August 28, 2014 712 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: Defendants' Rule 50(B) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law re (689 in 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH, and 4347 in 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH). Signed by Judge Rebecca F. Doherty on 8/28/14. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
June 11, 2014 681 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST LILLY. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 6/11/14. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
January 23, 2014 529 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING : TAKEDA DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO NAME ADDITIONAL WITNESSES re 3879 in 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH and 516 in 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH. For the foregoing reasons, the Motion shall be GRANTED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/23/14. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
January 22, 2014 527 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING & ORDER: DEPOSITION OBJECTIONS. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/22/2014. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the Joint Submission of Deposition Packet of Helen Ge, the Joint Submission of Deposition Packet of Mary Ramstack, the Joint Su bmission of Deposition Packet of Shay Weisbrich are SUSTAINED in PART and OVERRULED in PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Joint Submission of Deposition Packet of Richard Daly is SUSTAINED in PART, OVERRULED in PART, and DEFERRED in PART. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
January 14, 2014 508 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: ADRIANE FUGH-BERMAN M.D. re (3542 in 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH and 359 in 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH) Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Adriane Fugh-Berman. For the following reasons, the Motion will be DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/14/14. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
January 10, 2014 505 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: DAVID A KESSLER, M.D. re (3471 in 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH and 315 in 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH) MOTION Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert David Kessler, M.D.. For the foregoing reasons, the motion shall be DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/10/14. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
January 8, 2014 501 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re (3465 in 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH; and 309 in 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH); Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Herbert Barton Grossman, M.D.. The Defendants' Motion will be DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/8/14. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
January 7, 2014 488 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re (3408 in 6:11-md-02299) and (273 in 6:12-cv-00064) MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Helen Ge. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the DEFERRED portion of Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Helen Ge is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/7/14. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
January 6, 2014 480 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re (3467 in 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH and 311 in 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH) Fifth DAUBERT MOTION Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dipak Panigraphy, M.D.. For the foregoing reasons, the Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dipak Panigraphy, M.D. shall be DENIED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 01/06/14. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
January 3, 2014 471 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re (3430 in 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH) and re (295 in 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Testimony to the July/August 2013 AACE/ACE Diabetes and Cancer Consensus Statement. Considering the foregoi ng Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Testimony to the July/August 2013 AACE/ACE Diabetes and Cancer Consensus Statement is DENIED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/3/14. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
December 20, 2013 465 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: SCOTT DELACROIX, UROLOGIC ONCOLOGIST: (3463 in 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH) for the foregoing reasons the Defendant's MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert, Dr. Scott Delacroix shall be DENIED as to both general and specific causation. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 12/20/13. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
December 19, 2013 463 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: DEVELOPMENT OF BLADDER CANCER WITHIN ONE YEAR OF EXPOSURE. For the foregoing reasons, the Defendants Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Experts that Actos Can Cause Bladder Cancer Within One Year of Use, document 3466 shall be DENIED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 12/19/13. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
December 17, 2013 461 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING regarding Motions in Limine filed between October 4, 2013 and October 16, 2013. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 12/17/13. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
December 4, 2013 449 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING:Expert Testimony of Kristin Kucsma, M.A., Regarding Punitive Damages Methodology. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 12/4/13. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
December 3, 2013 447 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING : EXPERT TESTIMONY CONCERNING "OUTCOME SCENARIO II" re Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Experts (313 in 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH and 3469 in 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 12/3/13. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
November 13, 2013 384 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re Motions in Limine: (3403 -3409 in 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH), (3412 in 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH), (3414 in 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH), (3420 in 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH), (3428-3429 in 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH) and (3430 in 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 11/13/2013. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
November 5, 2013 357 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING regarding Motions in Liminie. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 11/5/13. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
October 10, 2013 265 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING regarding Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 10/10/13. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)
October 2, 2013 250 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING regarding motions in liminie filed on September 16, 2013. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 10/2/13. Associated Cases: 6:11-md-02299-RFD-PJH, 6:12-cv-00064-RFD-PJH(crt,Brown, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Allen
Represented By: Paul J Pennock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Allen
Represented By: Paul J Pennock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceutical Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals North America Inc
Represented By: Nathan A Huey
Represented By: Sara J Gourley
Represented By: Colin J Garry
Represented By: James D Arden
Represented By: Sherry Ann Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals L L C
Represented By: James D Arden
Represented By: Colin J Garry
Represented By: Sara J Gourley
Represented By: Nathan A Huey
Represented By: Sherry Ann Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals International Inc
Represented By: James D Arden
Represented By: Colin J Garry
Represented By: Sara J Gourley
Represented By: Nathan A Huey
Represented By: Sherry Ann Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Global Research & Development Center Inc
Represented By: James D Arden
Represented By: Colin J Garry
Represented By: Sara J Gourley
Represented By: Nathan A Huey
Represented By: Sherry Ann Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda San Diego Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda California Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals U S A Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?