Delgado v. Marshals

Plaintiff: Maria Aide Delgado
Defendant: U S Marshals
Case Number: 6:2012cv00347
Filed: February 3, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Iberia
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING e 60 Report and Recommendations; denying 59 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. This Court hereby certifies that Delgado's appeal is not taken in good faith under 28 USC Section 1915(a)(3) and Rule 24(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Accordingly, Delgado's Motion to pursue her appeal in forma pauperis 59 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 11/18/14. (crt,Guidry, C)
September 3, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 51 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's civil rights action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and for failing to state a claim for which relief may be granted in accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii). The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this Judgment to the Keeper of the Three Strikes List, Tyler, Texas. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 9/3/14. (crt,Guidry, C)
April 3, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Clerk is hereby instructed not to accept any further filings from Ms. Delgado in this action which have not been specifically requested by this Court. For the above reasons; IT IS ORDERED that leave of court to file the Third Amended Complaint is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 48 PROPOSED Third Amended Complaint is hereby STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 4/2/2013. (crt,Gregory, C)
November 13, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 24 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's civil action against the United States Marshal Service, insorfar as it arises pursuant to the Federal Torts Claims Act (FTCA), be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of jurisdiction based upon plaintiff's admitted failure to exhaust the administrative remedies mandated by 28 USC Section 2675(a) prior to filing her civil action. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 11/13/12. (crt,Guidry, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delgado v. Marshals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Marshals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Aide Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?