Scarborough v. Integricert L L C

Defendant: Integricert L L C
Plaintiff: Randall Scarborough
Case Number: 6:2012cv00396
Filed: February 10, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Acadia
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2016 181 Opinion or Order of the Court REASONS FOR RULING re 155 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement of US Patent NOS 6,848,322 and 7,284,447 filed by Randall Scarborough. For the reasons herein, the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Scarborough [rec. doc. 155] is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/2/2016. (crt,Alexander, E)
August 31, 2015 153 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION: For the foregoing reasons, the Court construes the disputed terms as set out above. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 8/31/2015. (crt,Chicola, C)
August 12, 2015 151 Opinion or Order of the Court REASONS FOR RULING: For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that the scope of the Claims in the 322 and 447 Patents was not substantively changed through reexamination and that the amendments were merely clarifications of what had already been cla imed by Scarborough in his original Patents. Accordingly, The 122 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Scarborough is granted and the 123 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Integricert is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 8/12/2015. (crt,Chicola, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scarborough v. Integricert L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integricert L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Scarborough
Represented By: Guy E Matthews
Represented By: Elwood Clement Stevens, Jr
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?