Ramos et al v. Conway et al

Plaintiff: Jovanny Diaz Ramos, Jose Alberto Ramirez and Javier Enriquez Castillo
Defendant: Jacqueline S Conway, Hartt Transportation Systems Inc and CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 6:2012cv00699
Filed: March 20, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Acadia
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2014 111 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 103 Report and Recommendations,. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all claims filed by plaintiff, Javier Enriquez Castillo, be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 7/21/14. (crt,Jordan, P)
July 7, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 90 MOTION to Dismiss All Claims of Plaintiff, Jovany Diaz Ramos, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jacqueline S Conway, Canal Insurance Co, Paul Conway. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 7/3/14. (crt,Jordan, P)
October 23, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 72 Report and Recommendations,. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the trial of this matter is rescheduled to October 6, 2014 and the Clerk of Court is to re-issue a Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 10/23/13. (crt,Jordan, P)
August 8, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 68 Report and Recommendations; granting 52 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss; however, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the dismissal of Mr. Ramirez claims is DEFERRED until after the Court has ruled on the Motion for Contempt; denying as moot 40 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 40 Motion for Sanctions; denying as moot 40 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 8/8/13. (crt,Jordan, Paula)
June 10, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: Considering the foregoing, IT IS ORDERED that this Court declines to adopt the recommendation of the magistrate judge with respect to the "Motion to Dismiss All Claims and for Contempt, Sanctions and Attorney's Fees [Doc . 40], but rather, REMANDS the motion to the magistrate judge for further consideration, including a determination of whether the medical records in question were falsified by any party, if possible. On remand, the magistrate judge is asked to addre ss the issue of dismissal and/or contempt vis-a-vis each plaintiff, as described in this Ruling. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the "Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment of Dismissal" [Doc. 54] is DENIED AS MOOT, and the Court's Order of Dism issal [Doc. 53] is VACATED pursuant to Rule 60(a). Ramirez's "Rule 41 Motion to Dismiss" is hereby REFERRED to the magistrate judge for report and recommendation in conjunction with the pending "Motion to Dismiss All Claims and for Contempt, Sanctions and Attorney's Fees" [Doc. 40]. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 6/10/2013. (crt,Putch, A) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/12/2013: # 1 Notice of Manual Attachment-Sealed Exhibt A) (Putch, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos et al v. Conway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jovanny Diaz Ramos
Represented By: Neil Franz Nazareth
Represented By: Jason Z Landry
Represented By: Lawrence J Centola, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Alberto Ramirez
Represented By: Lawrence J Centola, III
Represented By: Jason Z Landry
Represented By: Neil Franz Nazareth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Enriquez Castillo
Represented By: Lawrence J Centola, III
Represented By: Jason Z Landry
Represented By: Neil Franz Nazareth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline S Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartt Transportation Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CANAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?