Progressive Waste Solutions of LA, Inc. v. Lafayette

Plaintiff: Progressive Waste Solutions of LA Inc
Defendant: Consolidated Government of Lafayette
Case Number: 6:2012cv00851
Filed: April 9, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2015 152 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 109 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Progressive Waste Solutions of LA Inc. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 1/13/15. (crt,Jordan, P)
November 5, 2014 126 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON ATTORNEYS' FEES. For the reasons assigned herein, the Court hereby awards the sum of $5,138.75 to Laborde and Mandich, and awards $5,163.75 to Torian for attorney's fees, and $1,046.25 in expenses, for a total of $11,348.75.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 11/5/2014. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 22, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING AND ORDER on Motion for Contempt and Sanctions. ORDER denying 103 Motion for Contempt. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Progressive produce all financial and related documentation for any and all operations which occur at Progressive& #039;s Duson facility within ten (10) days. ORDER granting 103 Motion for Sanctions as stated within this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the re-depositions of the Progressive personnel are to be scheduled immediately, and are to be taken as soo n as possible after the production of the financial information. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the sanctions imposed hereby are against counsel, and are to be paid by counsel or his law firm and not by the client, Progressive. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 10/22/2014. (crt,Yocum, M)
June 18, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 77 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government's Third Party Demand filed by Recycling Foundation Inc. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 6/17/14. (crt,Jordan, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Waste Solutions of LA, Inc. v. Lafayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Waste Solutions of LA Inc
Represented By: Kelly McCall Brian
Represented By: Guice Anthony Giambrone, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Government of Lafayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?