Simon v. Longnecker Properties, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Clarence J Simon
Defendant: Longnecker Properties Inc, M/V Seacor Washington, General Electric Capital, Stabil Drill L L C and Stabil Drill Inc
Counter_claimant: Longnecker Properties Inc
Counter_defendant: Clarence J Simon
Case Number: 6:2012cv01178
Filed: May 7, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2015 297 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT granting 277 Motion to Dismiss; granting 277 Motion ; granting 294 Motion for Leave to File; dismissed with prejudice 244 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 245 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 246 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 247 Motion for Summary Judgment; denied as moot 260 Daubert Motion; denied as moot 261 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 12/28/15. (crt,Guidry, C)
July 15, 2015 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 218 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 235 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 07/14/2015. (crt,Williams, L)
June 9, 2014 203 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 168 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Longnecker Properties Inc. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 6/6/14. (crt,Jordan, P)
February 19, 2014 164 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 140 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas Energy Services L L C. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 2/14/14. (crt,Jordan, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon v. Longnecker Properties, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longnecker Properties Inc
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Seacor Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stabil Drill L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stabil Drill Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence J Simon
Represented By: James Patrick MacManus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Longnecker Properties Inc
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Clarence J Simon
Represented By: James Patrick MacManus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?