Moench v. M/V Salvation

Plaintiff: George T Moench
Defendant: M/V Salvation, Marquette Transportation Co Gulf Inland L L C, Kirby Inland Marine L P, Basin Fleeting Inc, A B C Insurance Co, D E F Insurance Co and X Y Z Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2012cv01536
Filed: June 5, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2016 206 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 203 MOTION to Enforce Judgment (Motion and Memorandum for Expedited Order Directing Defendant Marquette and/or the Surety to Promptly Pay the Judgments Against Marquette) filed by George T Moench, Jennifer J Aregood. Having received no timely opposition to plaintiffs motion on the merits, and finding the motion to be well-founded in fact and law as to RLI, the Court GRANTS plaintiffs motion 203 to the extent it seeks an order directing... the Surety to promptly pay the judgments against Marquette.. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 12/22/16. (crt,Guidry, C)
August 17, 2015 178 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 155 Motion for Amended Findings Under FRCP Rule 52; granting in part and denying in part 155 Motion to Alter Judgment; denying 155 Motion for New Trial; granting in part and denying in part 166 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 8/17/2015. (crt,Dauterive, C)
April 24, 2015 153 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs against Marquette Transportation Company Inland Gulf,LLC. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 4/24/15. (crt,Jordan, P)
April 23, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 27 Motion for Summary Judgment; ( 83 Motion for Hearing re Motion for Summary Judgment terminated); denying 39 Motion in Limine; denying in part 40 Motion in Limine; denying 41 Motion in Limine; denying 59 Motion in L imine; granting 95 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Opposition; 93 Motion in Limine to Exclude Responses to Written Questions by a Coast Guard Officer will be addressed in a timely manner once the opposing parties have had a chance to respond. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 4/8/2014. (crt,Dauterive, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moench v. M/V Salvation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George T Moench
Represented By: Henry St Paul Provosty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Salvation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquette Transportation Co Gulf Inland L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirby Inland Marine L P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basin Fleeting Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D E F Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?