Aspen Specialty Insurance Co v. Technical Industries Inc

Plaintiff: Aspen Specialty Insurance Co
Defendant: Technical Industries Inc
Case Number: 6:2012cv02315
Filed: September 5, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2015 134 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: Currently pending before this Court is Evanston Insurance Co's 73 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Technical Industries, Inc.s claim seeking the recovery of damages for Evanston's alleged bad faith. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, the motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 2/12/2015. (crt,Alexander, E)
January 28, 2015 127 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: Currently pending before this Court is Aspen Specialty Insurance Co's 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Technical Industries Inc's counterclaim seeking the recovery of damages for Aspen's alleged bad faith. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, the motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/28/2015. (crt,Alexander, E)
January 27, 2015 126 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: Currently pending before this Court is Evanston Insurance Co's 75 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Technical Industries, Inc.'s Bad Faith Claims Under Louisiana Revised Statute 22:1892(A) filed by Evan ston Insurance Co. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, the motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/27/2015. (crt,Alexander, E)
January 22, 2015 123 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: The Court ordered the parties to submit briefs "addressing whether the actions of Aspen Specialty Insurance Co and Evanston Insurance Co, which occurred during the prosecution of the underlying lawsuit and are alleged by Techn ical Industries Inc to be the basis of bad faith claims, should be viewed as being governed by Louisiana law or Texas law." (Rec. Doc. 113). The parties complied with the order and submitted briefs. The Court concludes that Louisiana law governs the issues raised in this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/22/2015. (crt,Alexander, E)
December 2, 2014 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 86 Motion to Strike 85 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 84 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 83 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion ; granting 87 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/2/14. (crt,Kennedy, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aspen Specialty Insurance Co v. Technical Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspen Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Robert I Siegel
Represented By: Alistair Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technical Industries Inc
Represented By: Gerald C Delaunay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?