Castille et al v. Apache Deepwater L L C et al

Plaintiff: Rory L Castille and Natasha Castille
Defendant: Apache Deepwater L L C and Island Operating Co Inc
Case Number: 6:2012cv02892
Filed: November 14, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 43:1331 General Maritime/OCSLA
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2017 219 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum filed by B P America Production Co. Accordingly, BP's motion for summary judgment will be granted, and the plaintiffs' claims against BP will be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/11/2017. (crt,Chicola, C)
June 27, 2017 209 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 161 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Apache Deepwater L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/27/2017. (crt,Chicola, C)
June 20, 2017 198 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 156 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Island Operating Co Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/20/2017. (crt,Chicola, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castille et al v. Apache Deepwater L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rory L Castille
Represented By: James Harvey Domengeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Castille
Represented By: James Harvey Domengeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apache Deepwater L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Operating Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?