Mason et al v. Lafayette et al

Plaintiff: Brenda Mason and Billy C Mason
Defendant: Jim Craft, Martin Faul, Lafayette City Parish Consolidated Government and James P Craft
Case Number: 6:2012cv02939
Filed: November 20, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2017 123 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 122 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment 44 on the basis of qualified immunity as to the remanded issue of the first five shots is DENIED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 6/15/2017. (crt,Guidry, C)
March 31, 2017 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 105 Motion Trial by Jury. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/31/2017. (crt,Chicola, C)
March 18, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiffs have already had an opportunity to make this factual argument, and the Court sees no reason to permit them a second bite at the apple. As such, "the facts in this case do not warrant the extraordinary relief associated with the granting of a motion for reconsideration." Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's 74 Motion for Reconsideration and/or Motion for New Trial is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 3/17/2014. (crt,Putch, A)
December 10, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment dismissing plaintiffs' federal and state law claims against each defendant with prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on December 6, 2013. (crt,Bacon, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason et al v. Lafayette et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Faul
Represented By: Ray Frank Lucas, III
Represented By: Joy C Rabalais
Represented By: Kathy L Smith
Represented By: Tonya Renee Smith
Represented By: John F Wilkes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafayette City Parish Consolidated Government
Represented By: Ray Frank Lucas, III
Represented By: Joy C Rabalais
Represented By: Kathy L Smith
Represented By: Tonya Renee Smith
Represented By: John F Wilkes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P Craft
Represented By: Ray Frank Lucas, III
Represented By: Joy C Rabalais
Represented By: Kathy L Smith
Represented By: Tonya Renee Smith
Represented By: John F Wilkes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Mason
Represented By: David C Laborde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy C Mason
Represented By: David C Laborde
Represented By: Jeanne M Laborde
Represented By: Paulin J Laborde, Jr
Represented By: Andrew Ballard Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?