Yousef et al v. Falcon et al

Plaintiff: Salah Yousef and Yousef Investments L L C
Defendant: Kerry Falcon and Michael W Neustrom
Case Number: 6:2013cv00542
Filed: March 13, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2016 74 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 69 Report and Recommendations, granting 59 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, dismissing action with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 10/21/16. (crt,Roaix, G)
September 29, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion to maintain case on court's administrative docket; Clerk ordered to reopen action and re-issue a trial date and scheduling order. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on September 26, 2014. (crt,Dunford, T) Modified file date on 9/29/2014 (Dunford, T).
December 20, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael W Neustrom, Kerry Falcon. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 12/19/13. (crt,Jordan, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yousef et al v. Falcon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salah Yousef
Represented By: William L Goode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yousef Investments L L C
Represented By: William L Goode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Falcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W Neustrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?