Price v. Rayne et al

Defendant: City of Rayne, Police Dept of Rayne, Carroll Stelly, Joseph Credeur, Joseph Cormier and X Y Z Insurance Co
Plaintiff: Wendell Dwayne Price
Case Number: 6:2013cv00790
Filed: April 17, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Acadia
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 57 MOTION for Reconsideration of 56 Judgment on Motion for Summary Judgment re Dismissing State Law Claims without prejudice, filed by Joseph Cormier, City of Rayne, Joseph Credeur, Carroll Stelly. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 5/3/16. (crt,Crawford, A)
March 3, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Joseph Cormier, City of Rayne, Joseph Credeur, Carroll Stelly. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 3/3/16. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
September 28, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court RULE 7(a) HEIGHTENED PLEADING REVIEW ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within twenty (20) days of this order, plaintiff shall file a reply to the qualified immunity defense pled by Rayne Chief of Police Carrol Stelly in his individual capacity. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant(s) shall not file any response to the plaintiff's reply. The purpose of this order is to determine whether discovery should be banned or limited with respect to Chief Stelly, pending the filing of a Rule 12(b) Motion to dismiss, or alternatively, a motion for summary judgment on the basis of qualified immunity by Chief Stelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 09/28/2015. (crt,Yocum, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Rayne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Rayne
Represented By: Ray Frank Lucas, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Joy C Rabalais(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Adriane Michelle Reese(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kathy L Smith(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Tonya Renee Smith(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John F Wilkes, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Dept of Rayne
Represented By: Ray Frank Lucas, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Joy C Rabalais(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Adriane Michelle Reese(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kathy L Smith(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Tonya Renee Smith(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John F Wilkes, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carroll Stelly
Represented By: Ray Frank Lucas, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Adriane Michelle Reese(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kathy L Smith(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Tonya Renee Smith(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John F Wilkes, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Credeur
Represented By: Ray Frank Lucas, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Joy C Rabalais(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Adriane Michelle Reese(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kathy L Smith(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Tonya Renee Smith(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John F Wilkes, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Cormier
Represented By: Ray Frank Lucas, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Joy C Rabalais(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Adriane Michelle Reese(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kathy L Smith(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Tonya Renee Smith(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John F Wilkes, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Represented By: Ray Frank Lucas, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Joy C Rabalais(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Adriane Michelle Reese(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kathy L Smith(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Tonya Renee Smith(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John F Wilkes, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendell Dwayne Price
Represented By: Harold D Register, Jr(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?