Cottonwood Development v. Moter et al

Plaintiff: Cottonwood Development
Defendant: Charles Walter Moter, U S Internal Revenue Service, State of Louisiana, School Board of Lafayette Parish and N C O Portfolio Management Inc
Case Number: 6:2013cv00954
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2410 Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING - For the following reasons, the motion 33 is GRANTED, and the Court finds the United States' federal tax lien survived the sale of the parcel of real property at issue, and further finds plaintiff Cottonwood Development holds a claim in priority to the federal tax lien to the extent of the property taxes it has paid in relation to the property. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 12/5/16. (crt,Guidry, C)
June 14, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 46 Report and Recommendations ; granting 39 Motion for Default Judgment and DEFAULT JUDGMENT is ENTERED in favor of the U S Internal Revenue Service. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 06/14/2016. (crt,Williams, L)
May 7, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 5/7/15. (crt,Guidry, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cottonwood Development v. Moter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cottonwood Development
Represented By: Melissa Tannehill Castille
Represented By: Van Vy Ky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Walter Moter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Laura M Conner
Represented By: Jennifer B Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: School Board of Lafayette Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N C O Portfolio Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?