Lavergne v. Martinez

Plaintiff: Brandon Scott Lavergne
Defendant: Laincy Vasseur Martinez
Case Number: 6:2013cv02121
Filed: June 24, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: West Feliciana
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 MOTION for Rehearing re 25 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 10/16/2014. (crt,Williams, L)
March 6, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 14 Report and Recommendations,,,. IT IS ORDERED that Lavergne's complaint be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 3/6/14. (crt,Jordan, P)
July 19, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion for TRO and Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Michael Hill on 7/19/2013. (crt,Gregory, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lavergne v. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laincy Vasseur Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Scott Lavergne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?