Miller et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp

Plaintiff: James Miller and Victoria Miller
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp
Case Number: 6:2013cv02658
Filed: September 13, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING ADOPTING 39 Report and Recommendations. In light of the foregoing, the 33 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, and the claims of plaintiffs against this defendant are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 8/18/15. (crt,Guidry, C)
June 23, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING - In light of the foregoing, the 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and plaintiffs claims against ASI are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 6/23/15. (crt,Guidry, C)
January 29, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING AND ORDERS: Currently pending before the Court is the plaintiff's 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, which is opposed by the defendant. IT IS ORDERED that the motion for leave to amend is GRANTED without prejudice to the right of the newly added defendant to challenge the claims made against it. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the trial of the captioned matter, currently set for 4/6/2015, is CONTINUED WITHOUT DATE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the current Scheduling Order is hereby VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 1/29/2015. (crt,Alexander, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. American Strategic Insurance Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Miller
Represented By: Matthew D McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Miller
Represented By: Matthew D McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?