Broussard v. Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government et al

Plaintiff: Dana L Broussard
Defendant: Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government, Lester Joseph Durel, Jr, Dee Edward Stanley, James P Craft, George Alfred, Cornell Montgomery, Terry Head, Richard Rees, Ray Domingue and Mike Brown
Case Number: 6:2013cv02872
Filed: October 16, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 58 Report and Recommendations. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the defendants' 21 Motion for Sanctions is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 8/18/15. (crt,Guidry, C)
February 20, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 51 Report and Recommendations. Accordingly, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the defendants' motions to tax costs and for attorneys fees 40 and 42 are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motions are granted relative to the defendants' motion to tax costs in the amounts referenced in the record. The motions are denied relative to the defendants' efforts to recover attorney's fees from Plaintiff pursuant to Section 1988 as a prevailing party defendants. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 2/19/15. (crt,Guidry, C)
December 3, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 33 Report and Recommendations.IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the defendants' motions for summary judgment, brought in the alternative to motions to dismiss under Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(5 and (6), Rec. Docs 6 and 7 are GRANTED, and the remainder of the plaintiff's claims are thereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 12/2/14. (crt,Guidry, C)
September 5, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 31 Report and Recommendations. It is hereby ORDERED that the 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim are GRANTED in part, and DENIED in part. The defendants 9; motions to dismiss are DENIED in all other respects. The defendants' 21 Motion for Sanctions and the alternative motions for summary judgment on qualified immunity are DEFERRED.. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 9/4/14. (crt,Guidry, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broussard v. Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana L Broussard
Represented By: John Christopher Alexander, Sr
Represented By: Stanley Stephen Spring, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Joseph Durel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee Edward Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Alfred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornell Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Head
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Domingue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?