Gotreaux v. Apache Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Corey Blake Gotreaux
Defendant: Apache Corp, Fluid Crane Ltd, Cheramie Holdings L L C and M/V Randi Katherine
Case Number: 6:2013cv03235
Filed: December 13, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Jefferson Davis
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2015 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff 235 Motion for Settlement and for Statutory Penalties, Motion for Attorney Fees is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/29/2015. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 11, 2015 225 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING. Having found that genuine issues of material fact exist concerning the plaintiff's role in the accident, IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiffs 157 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the issue of his contributory negligence is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/11/2015. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 25, 2015 142 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 86 Motion for Sanctions; denying 86 Motion to Compel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall, not later than twenty-one days after the date of this order, pay to Alert Weather Services Inc the sum of $492.50. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/25/15. (crt,Whidden, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gotreaux v. Apache Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apache Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluid Crane Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheramie Holdings L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Randi Katherine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Blake Gotreaux
Represented By: Joseph Quentin Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?