Century Surety Co v. Blevins et al

Plaintiff: Century Insurance Co
Defendant: Cylie Blevins, Jeffrey Dugas and Sohum L L C
Case Number: 6:2014cv00411
Filed: February 18, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part 40 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 9/5/14. (crt,Jordan, P)
July 10, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 24 MOTION for Partial Dismissal of Bad Faith Claims and Unfair Commercial Practices filed by Century Surety Co. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 7/8/14. (crt,Jordan, P)
May 19, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER granting 21 Motion to Set Aside Default; terminating 16 Motion for Default Judgment. IT IS ORDERED that the Order entered on April 30, 2014 (Doc No 22) is hereby VACATED and amended as herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the April 14, 2014 default entered against Cylie Blevins, individually and as Tutor for her minor son, Jeffery Dugas II is VACATED and the Clerk of court is to terminated the plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment as to Cylie Blevins, individually and as Tutor for her minor son, Jeffrey Dugas, II. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 05/15/2014. (crt,Yocum, M)
April 30, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion to Set Aside Default. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 4/14/2014 default entered against Swiftships Shipbuilders L L C is VACATED and the Clerk of Court is to remove the deficiency on defendants' Answer to Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 4/30/14. (crt,Kennedy, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Century Surety Co v. Blevins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cylie Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Dugas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sohum L L C
Represented By: Anthony M Fazzio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Century Insurance Co
Represented By: Charlotte Jane Sawyer
Represented By: Jay R Sever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?