IberiaBank v. Broussard et al

Plaintiff: IberiaBank
Defendant: Darryl R Broussard and Brayton Peltier
Counter_claimant: Darryl R Broussard
Counter_defendant: IberiaBank
Case Number: 6:2014cv02448
Filed: August 7, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2016 135 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING For the reasons provided above, the motion for partial summary judgment 112 filed by defendant/counter-plaintiff Darryl R. Broussard is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED to the extent it seeks a judgment aw arding Broussard attorneys fees for controversies or claims arising out of the CCSA, however, limited to only those incurred while this matter was in arbitration; the motion is DENIED in all other aspects. The motion for summary judgment 114 filed by IBERIABANK is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is DENIED to the extent it seeks a judgment dismissing all of Broussards claim for attorneys fees for controversies or claims arising out of the CCSA, specifically noting the motion would include those fees incurred during arbitration; the motion is GRANTED in all other aspects. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 9/30/16. (crt,Guidry, C)
August 30, 2016 132 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 111 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. For the reasons provided, IBERIABANK'S motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTED, and Broussard's claim for intentional interference with business relations is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 8/30/16. (crt,Guidry, C)
January 20, 2016 103 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 94 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that defendant, Darryl R. Broussard's Motion to Dismiss Unfair Competition and Trade Practices Claim of Iberia Bank 56 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/20/16. (crt,Guidry, C)
January 5, 2016 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING -Currently pending before the Court is a re 59 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Counterclaim, Claim 5, Attorneys Fees Claimed by Broussard filed by IberiaBank For the following reasons, the motion is DENIED. In light of the reasons provided above, the motion for summary judgment 59 seeking dismissal of Broussard's claim for attorney's fees is DENIED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/5/16. (crt,Guidry, C)
December 15, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON APPEAL re 44 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge regarding 42 Minutes, granting Leave to File Second Amended and Restated Counterclaim filed by IberiaBank. For the reasons provided above, the Order of the Magistrat e Judge is AFFIRMED IN PART and REVERSED IN PART. The Order is affirmed to the extent that it grants leave for defendant Darryl L. Bourssard to file a supplemental counterclaim for intentional interference with business relations; the order is reversed to the extent it grants leave for defendant to assert counterclaims of negligence and abuse of rights. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 12/15/15. (crt,Guidry, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IberiaBank v. Broussard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IberiaBank
Represented By: Cliff A LaCour
Represented By: Andrew Russell Lee
Represented By: Francis X Neuner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl R Broussard
Represented By: Travis J Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brayton Peltier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Darryl R Broussard
Represented By: Travis J Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: IberiaBank
Represented By: Cliff A LaCour
Represented By: Andrew Russell Lee
Represented By: Francis X Neuner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?