Mosing et al v. Boston et al
Plaintiff: |
Kendall Garrett Mosing and Zloop LA L L C |
Defendant: |
Robert Boston, Robert LaBarge, Zloop L L C and Zloop Inc |
Case Number: |
6:2014cv02608 |
Filed: |
August 28, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana |
Office: |
Lafayette Office |
County: |
Lafayette |
Presiding Judge: |
Patrick J Hanna |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard T Haik |
Nature of Suit: |
Securities/Commodities |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 22, 2017 |
Filing
174
MEMORANDUM RULING re 148 Motion to Stay. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained below, the motion is GRANTED and this matter is STAYED pending the resolution of the criminal proceeding. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/22/2017. (crt,Alexander, E)
|
April 27, 2017 |
Filing
143
MEMORANDUM RULING: Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, the 121 Motion for Reconsideration re 70 Memorandum Ruling is GRANTED, this Court's prior 70 Transfer Or der is VACATED, and the 108 Motion to Withdraw 84 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District of Delaware Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1404(a) and 1412 and 11 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Western District of North Carolina Pu rsuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) is DENIED AS MOOT. To the extent that the motion for reconsideration and rescission of the transfer order (Rec. Doc. 121) alternatively sought supplementation of the appeal record, the motion is DENIED AS MOOT because the appeal itself was denied as moot (Rec. Doc. 126). Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 4/27/2017. (crt,Alexander, E)
|
June 25, 2015 |
Filing
71
TRANSFER ORDER: In accordance with the Court's 70 Memorandum Ruling, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, pursuant to provisions of 28 U.S.C. §1404(A) and after all appropriate appeal delays have run, this matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina for all furtherproceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/25/2015. (crt,Putch, A)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?