Mays et al v. Chevron Pipe Line Co et al

Plaintiff: Peggy Mays, Daphne Lanclos, Brent Mays and Jared Mays
Defendant: Chevron Pipe Line Co and Chevron Midstream Pipelines L L C
Case Number: 6:2014cv03098
Filed: October 23, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Vermilion
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2017 113 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 101 MOTION to Amend 98 Memorandum Ruling to Certify for Interlocutory Appeal, MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Chevron Pipe Line Co. For the following reasons, the motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 5/16/2017. (crt,Guidry, C)
January 10, 2017 98 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING For the reason set forth above, the Court finds there are triable issues of fact which preclude summary judgment. Accordingly, plaintiffs' 89 MOTION for Reconsideration is GRANTED, and the 29 MOTION for Summary Judgm ent filed by Chevron Midstream Pipelines L L C, Chevron Pipe Line Co is DENIED to the extent it seeks dismissal of the claims brought by plaintiffs against Chevron Pipe Line Company. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/10/17. (crt,Guidry, C)
March 2, 2016 87 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING For the following reasons, the 63 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by defendant Chevron Midstream Pipelines, LLC is GRANTED. As all claims in this matter have now been dismissed, the parties are ORDERED to submit a proposed final judgment, approved as to form, within fifteen days of issuance of this Ruling. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 3/2/16. (crt,Guidry, C)
February 23, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is granted to the extent is seeks dismissal of the claims brought by plaintiffs against Chevron Pipe Line Company; the motion is denied to the extent it seeks dismissal of plaintiffs' claims against Chevron Midstream Pipelines, LLC. The motion to Strike 50 MOTION to Strike is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 2/23/16. (crt,Guidry, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays et al v. Chevron Pipe Line Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Mays
Represented By: Jill Swearingen Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daphne Lanclos
Represented By: Jill Swearingen Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Mays
Represented By: Jill Swearingen Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Mays
Represented By: Jill Swearingen Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Pipe Line Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Midstream Pipelines L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?