Lewis v. Republic Fire & Casualty Insurance Co et al

Plaintiff: Karen Lewis
Defendant: Republic Fire & Casualty Insurance Co, Keith Brown and Crawford & Co
Case Number: 6:2015cv00035
Filed: January 7, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 76 Motion to Set Fee of Republic Fire and Casualty Insurance Company's Experts William "Chunky" Folks and Louis G. Fey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 05/13/2016. (crt,Thomas, T)
January 8, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING IT IS ORDERED that the 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment is DENIED for the reasons stated herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the re 42 MOTION to Strike is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ten days after the date of this Ruling, the parties shall jointly contact the Court for the purpose of scheduling a telephone status conference to discuss this matter, particularly in light of the recently-denied motion to continue deadlines 49 . The parties shall be prepar ed to discuss this Courts grave concerns as to the position taken by Republic in this matter, i.e., that the Appraisal Award is invalid despite Republics failure to comply with a key requirement of the appraisal provision, that is, the selection of an umpire. This Court will discuss the foregoing in the context of what additional discovery needs to be completed in this case, and in connection with the plaintiffs bad faith claims.. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/8/16. (crt,Guidry, C)
June 10, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT granting 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; adopting Report and Recommendations re 21 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 6/10/15. (crt,Kennedy, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Republic Fire & Casualty Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Lewis
Represented By: Joseph F LaHatte, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Fire & Casualty Insurance Co
Represented By: Angie Arceneaux Akers
Represented By: Jay M Lonero
Represented By: Thomas H Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Brown
Represented By: Angie Arceneaux Akers
Represented By: Jay M Lonero
Represented By: Thomas H Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford & Co
Represented By: Angie Arceneaux Akers
Represented By: Jay M Lonero
Represented By: Thomas H Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?