Practical Healthcare Supply Inc v. AssuredPartners Gulf Coast Insurance Agency L L C et al

Plaintiff: Practical Healthcare Supply Inc
Defendant: AssuredPartners Gulf Coast Insurance Agency L L C, Frankie S Harris, III, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co and Peerless Indemnity Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2015cv00235
Filed: February 5, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 42 Report and Recommendations. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that plaintiff's claims against AssuredPartners Gulf Coast Insurance Agency, LLC d/b/a/ Landry Harris & Co., be dismissed, consistent with the report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/7/16. (crt,Guidry, C)
August 18, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 31 Report and Recommendations. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the plaintiff's claims against defendant Frankie S. Harris, III, be dismissed, consistent with the report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 8/18/15. (crt,Guidry, C)
June 17, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, the 8 Motion to Remand is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/17/2015. (crt,Alexander, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Practical Healthcare Supply Inc v. AssuredPartners Gulf Coast Insurance Agency L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Practical Healthcare Supply Inc
Represented By: Michael M Meunier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AssuredPartners Gulf Coast Insurance Agency L L C
Represented By: James H Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frankie S Harris, III
Represented By: James H Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By: H Minor Pipes, III
Represented By: Susan Muller Rogge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Indemnity Insurance Co
Represented By: H Minor Pipes, III
Represented By: Susan Muller Rogge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?