Marks v. Westwind Helicopters Inc et al
Plaintiff: James Marks
Defendant: Westwind Helicopters Inc, G M Leasing Co L L C and Rolls-Royce Corp
Cross_claimant: Westwind Helicopters Inc
Cross_defendant: Rolls-Royce Corp
Case Number: 6:2015cv01735
Filed: May 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lafayette Office
County: St. Landry
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Presiding Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 RULING dismissing 164 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re 159 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D Dick on 8/15/2018. (crt,Whidden, C)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER denying 163 Motion for Reconsideration re 159 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/28/2017. (crt,Chicola, C)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 JUDGMENT ADOPTING 80 Report and Recommendations.IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Rolls-Royce Corporation's Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Shannon Jams, Canard Powell, and Joey Ganson's First Amended Complaint for Damages filed on September 30, 2015 53 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 9/30/16. (crt,Guidry, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marks v. Westwind Helicopters Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Marks
Represented By: Charles C Bourque, Jr
Represented By: Joseph G Jevic, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westwind Helicopters Inc
Represented By: Beth Elster Abramson
Represented By: Paul M Sterbcow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G M Leasing Co L L C
Represented By: Paul M Sterbcow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolls-Royce Corp
Represented By: Howard Carter Marshall
Represented By: Kevin Richard Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Westwind Helicopters Inc
Represented By: Beth Elster Abramson
Represented By: Paul M Sterbcow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Rolls-Royce Corp
Represented By: Howard Carter Marshall
Represented By: Kevin Richard Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?