Jones v. Louisiana et al

Plaintiff: Wallace Jones
Defendant: State of Louisiana, Michelle Bethea, Michelle Breaux, Herman Clause, Ursulyn Hamilton, Christopher Simmons, Phyllis Estilette, Lashonda G Derouen, Diane E Cote, Angel M Avans, Paige Douet and Allyson M Prejean
Case Number: 6:2015cv01816
Filed: June 2, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2016 92 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 84 Memorandum Ruling: This entire action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 10/14/2016. (crt,Williams, L)
September 29, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING For the following reasons the 34 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED, and plaintiff's claims against the State of Louisiana, through the Department of Children and Family Services ("DCFS"), and Cherly Bethea are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 9/29/16. (crt,Guidry, C)
September 28, 2016 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 30 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Herman Clause is GRANTED, and plaintiff's claims against Judge Herman Clause are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 9/28/16. (crt,Guidry, C)
July 28, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 65 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that the 55 Motion for Preliminary Instructive Relief Pending: Trial on the Merits be DENIED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 7/27/16. (crt,Guidry, C)
April 5, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING Report and Recommendations re 52 . IT IS ORDERED that the 44 Motion to Strike Amended Complaint be DENIED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 4/4/16. (crt,Guidry, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Louisiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wallace Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Bethea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Breaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herman Clause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ursulyn Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Estilette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lashonda G Derouen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane E Cote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel M Avans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paige Douet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allyson M Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?