Lebrun v. Baker Hughes Inc et al

Plaintiff: Jonathan Lebrun
Defendant: Transocean Ltd and Baker Hughes Inc
Case Number: 6:2015cv01828
Filed: June 9, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Acadia
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:0688
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2017 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: As no new arguments have been presented which alter the reasoning or the conclusion reached by the Court on Plaintiff's 59 Motion for Summary Judgment, Plaintiff's 112 Motion for New Trial must be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 10/16/2017. (crt,Chicola, C)
September 18, 2017 108 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment on plaintiff's Sieracki seaman status filed by Jonathan Lebrun. The Court finds that oral argument on this Motion is not necessary. For the reasons that follow, the Motion will be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/18/2017. (crt,Chicola, C)
June 14, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING setting forth reasons for denying 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Plaintiff's Seaman Status, and granting 21 MOTION for Summary Judgmen. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 6/14/16. (crt,Whidden, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lebrun v. Baker Hughes Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Lebrun
Represented By: Mark L Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transocean Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Hughes Inc
Represented By: Bret C Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?