Goldman Sachs Bank U S A v. Moreno et al

Plaintiff: Goldman Sachs Bank U S A
Defendant: Michel B Moreno, Tiffany C Moreno, M B M 2011 D O H Grantor Retained Annuity Trust, T C M 2011 D O H Grantor Retained Annuity Trust, M B M 2011 M G H Grantor Retained Annuity Trust, T C M 2011 M G H Grantor Retained Annuity Trust, Moreno Properties Two L L C and Nicholson Estates L L C
Counter_claimant: Moreno Properties Two L L C and Nicholson Estates L L C
Counter_defendant: Goldman Sachs Bank U S A
Case Number: 6:2015cv02018
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: C Michael Hill
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING - For the reason set forth above, the 32 MOTION to Compel and the 44 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Motion to Compel are DENIED. The 41 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum is DENIED, as it raises new issues and intr oduces new evidence-some of which is inadmissible - for the first time in a proposed reply brief. The 42 MOTION to Strike Arguments and Evidence Or, Alternatively,MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendants' Reply Brief is DENIED AS MOOT. The 48 MOTION for Leave to Supplement the Record of the Case is DENIED, as the information contained therein is irrelevant to this executory proceeding. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 5/24/16. (crt,Guidry, C)
September 15, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Currently pending before the Court is plaintiff, Goldmann Schs Bank USA's 9 Motion to Maintain Executory Proceeding, To Reconsider the Court's Ruling and For Writ of Seizure and Sale. Pursuant to its motion, plaintiff moves this Court "to reconsider its [prior] ruling and maintain this matter as an executory proceeding" pursuant to Louisiana law, and based upon the foregoing, issue writs of seizure and sale for certain properties owned by defendants. In light of the foregoing, plaintiff's motion is GRANTED, and the writes requested will issue forthwith. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 9/15/2015. (crt,Putch, A)
July 30, 2015 7 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Plaintiff Goldman Sachs Bank U S A has filed with this Court, 1 Verified Complaint to Foreclose by Executory Process, With Benefit of Appraisal. By its complaint, plaintiff asks this Court to issue writs of seizure and sale of certain pr operties owned by defendants, utilizing the rules of executory process set forth in the La.Civil Code. Jurisdiction is based upon diversity of citizenship. In light of the foregoing, the writs requested by plaintiff WILL NOT ISSUE at this time. If plaintiff wishes to maintain this action as an executory proceeding, rather than an ordinary proceeding, it must first demonstrate such relief is available in this Court. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 7/30/2015. (crt,Putch, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldman Sachs Bank U S A v. Moreno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goldman Sachs Bank U S A
Represented By: Laura F Ashley
Represented By: Carmen M Rodriguez
Represented By: R Patrick Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michel B Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany C Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M B M 2011 D O H Grantor Retained Annuity Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C M 2011 D O H Grantor Retained Annuity Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M B M 2011 M G H Grantor Retained Annuity Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C M 2011 M G H Grantor Retained Annuity Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moreno Properties Two L L C
Represented By: William E Steffes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholson Estates L L C
Represented By: William E Steffes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Moreno Properties Two L L C
Represented By: William E Steffes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Nicholson Estates L L C
Represented By: William E Steffes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Goldman Sachs Bank U S A
Represented By: Laura F Ashley
Represented By: Carmen M Rodriguez
Represented By: R Patrick Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?