Spisak v. Apache Corp et al
Plaintiff: |
Timothy Ben Spisak |
Defendant: |
Apache Corp, E N I U S Operating Co Inc and Williams Energy |
Case Number: |
6:2015cv02305 |
Filed: |
August 31, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana |
Office: |
Lafayette Office |
County: |
Lafayette |
Presiding Judge: |
Rebecca F Doherty |
Presiding Judge: |
Patrick J Hanna |
Nature of Suit: |
Marine |
Cause of Action: |
33 U.S.C. § 0901 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 12, 2017 |
Filing
155
MEMORANDUM RULING re 149 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim First Amended Answer of Stella Maris, LLC filed by Timothy Ben Spisak. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, the motion is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/12/2017. (crt,Alexander, E)
|
April 5, 2017 |
Filing
138
MEMORANDUM RULING re 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by E N I U S Operating Co Inc, Williams Field Services L L C, 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Liability of Defendants ENI U.S. Operating Co. and Williams Field Services LL C filed by Timothy Ben Spisak. The plaintiff's 68 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED to the extent that it addresses Williams's liability, the defendants' 79 Crossmotion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED to the extent that it addresses Williams's liability, and the plaintiff's claims against Williams are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. the plaintiff's 68 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED with regard to Eni's liability, and the defendants' 70 Crossmotion for Summary Judgment is also DENIED with regard to Eni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 4/5/2017. (crt,Alexander, E)
|
March 24, 2017 |
Filing
131
MEMORANDUM RULING re 93 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Liability filed by Stella Maris L L C. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons fully explained herein, the motion is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/24/2017. (crt,Alexander, E)
|
March 10, 2017 |
Filing
118
MEMORANDUM RULING re 91 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Apache Corp. IT IS ORDERED that Apache's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED, and the plaintiff's claims against Apache are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the oral argument on Apache's motion, which was previously scheduled for 3/23/2017, is CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/10/2017. (crt,Alexander, E)
|
March 8, 2017 |
Filing
115
MEMORANDUM RULING granting 78 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 92 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 03/08/2017. (crt,Williams, L)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?