Richard et al v. Flowers Foods, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Antoine Richard, Darrell Richard, Chris Meche, Derby Doucet, Sr, Kevin Rabeaux and Mark Louviere
Defendant: Flowers Foods Inc, Flowers Baking Co of Lafayette L L C, Flowers Baking Co of Baton Rouge L L C, Flowers Baking Co of Alexandria L L C and Flowers Baking Co of New Orleans L L C
Case Number: 6:2015cv02557
Filed: October 21, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2016 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION.... granting 105 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 11/28/16. (crt,Jordan, P)
November 3, 2016 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 123 Report and Recommendations; granting 83 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants, Flowers Baking Co of New Orleans, LLC, and Flowers Baking Co ofAlexandria, LLC, be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 11/3/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)
May 24, 2016 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion and the proposed Amendement is approved as to form with the additional language provided in the foregoing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/24/2016. (crt,Bunting, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard et al v. Flowers Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Richard
Represented By: Steven G Durio
Represented By: Ryan M Goudelocke
Represented By: Daniel Josef Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Richard
Represented By: Steven G Durio
Represented By: Ryan M Goudelocke
Represented By: Daniel Josef Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Meche
Represented By: Steven G Durio
Represented By: Ryan M Goudelocke
Represented By: Daniel Josef Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derby Doucet, Sr
Represented By: Steven G Durio
Represented By: Ryan M Goudelocke
Represented By: Daniel Josef Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Rabeaux
Represented By: Steven G Durio
Represented By: Ryan M Goudelocke
Represented By: Daniel Josef Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Louviere
Represented By: Steven G Durio
Represented By: Ryan M Goudelocke
Represented By: Daniel Josef Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Foods Inc
Represented By: Gregory Guidry
Represented By: Matthew M McCluer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co of Lafayette L L C
Represented By: Gregory Guidry
Represented By: Matthew M McCluer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co of Baton Rouge L L C
Represented By: Gregory Guidry
Represented By: Matthew M McCluer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co of Alexandria L L C
Represented By: Gregory Guidry
Represented By: Matthew M McCluer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowers Baking Co of New Orleans L L C
Represented By: Gregory Guidry
Represented By: Matthew M McCluer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?