Clay et al v. New Tech Global Ventures L L C
Plaintiff: |
Michael D Clay, Larre G Butler and Clayton Shamsie |
Defendant: |
New Tech Global Ventures L L C |
Case Number: |
6:2016cv00296 |
Filed: |
March 3, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana |
Office: |
Lafayette Office |
County: |
St. Martin |
Presiding Judge: |
Rebecca F Doherty |
Presiding Judge: |
Carol B Whitehurst |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 5, 2021 |
Filing
221
RULING and ORDER denying 214 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re 213 Order on Motion for Partial Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs. Signed by Judge John W deGravelles on 2/5/2021. (crt,Whidden, C)
|
April 15, 2020 |
Filing
213
MEMORANDUM RULING AND ORDER re 209 Motion for Partial Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs. For the reasons herein, the motion is granted to the extent it seeks to have the Court review the Clerk's taxation of costs but is denied to the extent that it seeks to alter the Clerk's taxation of costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/15/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
|
March 4, 2019 |
Filing
155
RULING & ORDER granting 71 New Tech's MOTION to Sever Claims Asserted by Opt-in Plaintiff Holbrook, MOTION to Strike Claims Asserted by Opt-in Plaintiff Holbrook and Holbrook's claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; grantin g in part and denying in part 89 New Tech's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 90 New Tech's MOTION for Decertification, MOTION to Sever Named Plaintiffs' Claims. Claims of opt-in Plai ntiffs Joshua William Warren, Joseph LaVelle Anderson and John Robertson Harvey are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; denying as moot 94 New Tech's MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Opt-In Plaintiff Gene Holbrook; denying 91 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Summary Judgment as to employee status, liability/backwages, and New Tech's good faith defense. Signed by Judge John W deGravelles on 3/4/2019. (crt,Dunford, T)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?