Mascagni v. Schlumberger Tech Corp

Plaintiff: Charles Mascagni
Defendant: Schlumberger Tech Corp
Case Number: 6:2016cv00439
Filed: April 1, 2016
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Acadia
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Referring Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 25 DAUBERT MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Accountant filed by Schlumberger Tech Corp and 47 MOTION in Limine filed by Schlumberger Tech Corp, filed by Schlumberger Tech Corp. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 9/15/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 22, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT denying 26 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Schlumberger Tech Corp. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 28 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Schlumberger Tech Corp is granted as to Plaintiff's allegation that Schlumberger Tech Corp acted willfully. A two-year statute-of-limitation period applies to Plaintiff's FSLA claims. The motion is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 8/22/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 2, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 6 Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 11/2/16. (crt,Crawford, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mascagni v. Schlumberger Tech Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Mascagni
Represented By: Jonathan H Adams
Represented By: Peter S Koeppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schlumberger Tech Corp
Represented By: Robert P Lombardi
Represented By: Geoffrey Andrew Mitchell
Represented By: Sam Zurik, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?