Alexander v. Neustrom et al

Plaintiff: Kenward Alexander, Jr
Defendant: Michael Neustrom, Jane Doe, John Doe, John Bernard and Sandy Riviere
Case Number: 6:2016cv00470
Filed: April 7, 2016
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Carol B Whitehurst
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2017 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss filed by the DOC defendants, Michelle David, Tamyra Young, Melanie Benedict, Stayce Falgout and Dr Raman Singh, [Rec. Doc. 81], is GRANTED IN PART, in that Plaintiff's state law claims against the DOC defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and Plantiff's § 1983 claims against the DOC defendants in their official capacities, with the exception of injunctive relief under the Ex Parte Young Doctrine, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and DENIED IN PART as to Plaintiff's § 1983 claims against the DOC Defendants in their individual capacities under Rule 12(b)(6). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 6/1/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
March 19, 2017 89 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: IT IS ORDERED that the unopposed 84 Motion To Dismiss Under FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) On Grounds Of Prematurity On Behalf Of Sandra Chaisson is GRANTED and Plaintiff's claims against Chaisson are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS PREMATURE pending completion of the Medical Review Panel Proceeding. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/19/2017. (crt,Chicola, C)
January 24, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 55 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Plaintiff's claims against the State of Louisiana through the Louisiana Department of Corrections are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 1/23/2017. (crt,Chicola, C)
September 6, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Bernard, Michael Neustrom, Bernard, Sandy Riviere, Sandy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 9/6/2016. (crt,Chicola, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Neustrom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Neustrom
Represented By: Sara Rodrigue Buggs
Represented By: James L Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bernard
Represented By: Sara Rodrigue Buggs
Represented By: James L Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Riviere
Represented By: Sara Rodrigue Buggs
Represented By: James L Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenward Alexander, Jr
Represented By: Glenn John Armentor
Represented By: James C Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?