Louviere v. W & T Offshore Inc et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey P Louviere
Defendant: W & T Offshore Inc and Helmerich & Payne International Drilling Co
Case Number: 6:2016cv00724
Filed: May 25, 2016
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Acadia
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 43:1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2018 100 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 51 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas to Produce Documents MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Helmerich & Payne International Drilling Co. IT IS ORDERED that within SEVEN days of this order, Zurich will prod uce to H&P and W&T the surveillance tapes and reports identified in its privilege log (subject to redaction ONLY for matters that may be attorney client or specific work product privileged). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that H&P and W&T will each reimburse Zurich 1/3rd of the total cost for the surveillance and reports and each of the cost for reproduction of the tapes and reports. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/29/2018. (crt,Alexander, E)
March 26, 2018 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 49 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff's 49 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment onthe issue of his own comparative fault, third party fault, and non-party fault is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/26/2018. (crt,Alexander, E)
November 15, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For reasons herein, W & T's request to compel the plaintiff to attend a neuropsychological examination conducted by Dr. Kevin W. Greve, Ph.D. is GRANTED. Accordingly, Jeffrey P. Louviere shall attend a neuropsychological examination by K evin W. Greve, which consists of an interview on November 16, 2017 from 9:00 a.m. to 11:00 a.m. and two-days of testing on November 27 and 28, 2017 from 9:00a.m. to 5:00p.m. each day, at the Jefferson Neurobehavioral Group's Lafayette Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/15/2017. (crt,Alexander, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louviere v. W & T Offshore Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey P Louviere
Represented By: Nicholas A Blanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W & T Offshore Inc
Represented By: Laura E Avery
Represented By: George B Jurgens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helmerich & Payne International Drilling Co
Represented By: Taylor Edward Brett
Represented By: Mark John Spansel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?