Loston v. St Mary Parish et al
Plaintiff: Ke'von Tramar Loston
Defendant: Sheriffs Office St Mary Parish, Mark A Hebert, Sennet Wiggins, Beau Martin and Richelle Bowman
Case Number: 6:2016cv00964
Filed: June 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lafayette Office
County: St. Mary
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM RULING re 113 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richelle Bowman, 117 MOTION to Strike Affidavit and Attachments and MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Ke'von Tramar Loston. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 6/26/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM RULING re 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Allstate Indemnity Co. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 4/5/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 18 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that the 8 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and accordingly, the St. Mary Parish Sheriff's Office is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from this lawsuit. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 1/4/17. (crt,Guidry, C)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 7(a) HEIGHTENED PLEADING REVIEW. After review, the undersigned concludes that the plaintiff has "supported his claims with sufficient precision and factual specificity to raise a genuine issue as to the illegality of defendants' conduct at the time of the alleged acts." Schultea, 47 F.3d at 1434. Thus, no order limiting discovery under Schultea is appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/9/2016. (crt,Alexander, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loston v. St Mary Parish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ke'von Tramar Loston
Represented By: Pride J Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriffs Office St Mary Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sennet Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beau Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richelle Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?