Jeanes v. McBride et al
Plaintiff: Janet Jeanes
Defendant: Greg McBride, Metal Buildings by Mac L L C, S & S Steel Buildings Inc, E Smith Plumbing Service Inc and Roy Bergis Smith
Case Number: 6:2016cv01259
Filed: September 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Evangeline
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER AND REASONS denying 215 Motion for Reconsideration re 202 Supplemental Order and Reasons, 194 Order and Reasons. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/25/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER re 180 Written Objections to Exhibits and Memorandum in Support filed by Janet Jeanes, 188 Objections to Exhibits and Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Exhibits filed by Greg McBride. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/22/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER AND REASONS: Before the Court are Objections to the Trial Deposition Testimony of Joey West, filed by Plaintiff Janet Jeanes. Defendant Greg McBride has filed responses to Jeanes' objections. For the reasons that follow, the Court SUSTAINS Objections 13 and 56 and OVERRULES Objection 4. The Court sets forth below the portions of West's deposition testimony McBride will be permitted to introduce at trial. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/14/2019. (crt,Putch, A)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER AND REASONS regarding 146 Motion in Limine to Exclude and/or Limit Plaintiff's Evidence and Testimony by Greg McBride. For the foregoing reasons, IT IS ORDERED that the motion in limine to exclude and/or limit testimony, filed by Defend ant Greg McBride be and hereby is GRANTED IN PART as to Decker's estimates of damages and DENIED IN PART as to evidence of design defects and evidence of defects in the concrete and plumbing at the Building. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/7/2019. (crt,Putch, A)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER AND REASONS granting 112 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 114 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 147 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/4/2019. (crt,Jordan, P)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeanes v. McBride et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Jeanes
Represented By: Jonathan David Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metal Buildings by Mac L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S & S Steel Buildings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Smith Plumbing Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Bergis Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?