Lewis v. Huval et al
Plaintiff: |
Tevin Lewis |
Defendant: |
Dwight Huval and Lafayette Consolidated Government |
Case Number: |
6:2016cv01280 |
Filed: |
September 12, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana |
Office: |
Lafayette Office |
County: |
Lafayette |
Presiding Judge: |
Rebecca F Doherty |
Presiding Judge: |
Patrick J Hanna |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 19, 2020 |
Filing
44
JUDGMENT adopting 43 Amended Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge granting 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs §1983 claims for excessive force and false arrest and all Fourth, Fifth, Eighth, Fourteenth, Monell, and st ate law claims for excessive force and false arrest are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It Is Further Ordered that Plaintiffs remaining state law claims for negligence, assault, and battery are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 5/19/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
|
May 4, 2020 |
Filing
43
AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 42 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment (entitled Re-Urged Motion to Dismiss) filed by Dwight Huval, Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government. For the reasons discussed herein, it is recommended that Defendants' 26 Re-Urged Motion to Dismiss, converted to Motion for Summary Judgment, be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 5/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/4/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
|
December 17, 2019 |
Filing
25
ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants' motion to dismiss (Rec. Doc. 24-2) is converted to a motion for summary judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall supplement the record in support of or in opposition to the pending motion, as converted, by submitting any relevant and appropriate summary-judgment-style evidence not later than January 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/17/2019. (crt,Alexander, E)
|
May 17, 2019 |
Filing
20
JUDGMENT adopting 16 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge denying without prejudice 6 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is given 15 days to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 5/17/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?