Frederick v. St. Mary Parish Law Enforcement Center
Plaintiff: William Charles Frederick
Defendant: St Mary Parish Law Enforcement Center
Case Number: 6:2017cv00828
Filed: June 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lafayette Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 JUDGMENT adopting 37 Report and Recommendations re 1 Complaint; 9 Complaint ; 15 Amended Complaint; 17 Amended Complaint ; 20 Amended Complaint, filed by William Charles Frederick. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 5/8/2020. (crt,Williams, L)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 JUDGMENT adopting 32 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all claims against defendants St. Mary Parish Law Enforcement Center, Sheriff Mark Hebert, Robyn Landry, Staff Tulane University Medical, Sharlen Joseph, and Warden Dadabar be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted, under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiffs claims against Capt ain Green for knowing Plaintiff had a conflict with another inmate yet refusing to move the inmate to another dorm, and for knowing about Plaintiffs complaints against Sharlen Joseph regarding mail, be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted, under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii).. Signed by Judge Michael J Juneau on 3/12/2020. (crt,Guidry, C)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint. Pro Se Response due by 1/12/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/13/2017. (crt,Haik, K)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULING Adopting the 2 Report and Recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. This matter is transferred to the Western District of Louisiana for further proceedings. A determination regarding Plaintiffs right to proceed as a pauper is deferred to the transferee court for resolution and disposition. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/27/2017. (LLH) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 6/28/2017.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frederick v. St. Mary Parish Law Enforcement Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Charles Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Mary Parish Law Enforcement Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?